Four Directions et al v. Committee on Judicial Conduct and Disability of the Judicial Conference of the United States
Petitioner: |
Four Directions, Indian People's Actions and Sara Plains Feather |
Respondent: |
Committee on Judicial Conduct and Disability of the Judicial Conference of the United States and Cathy A. Catterson |
Case Number: |
3:2014cv03022 |
Filed: |
July 1, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of California |
Office: |
Oakland Office |
County: |
XX US, Outside State |
Presiding Judge: |
Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1331 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 27, 2015 |
Filing
83
ORDER GRANTING RESPONDENTS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION; VACATING MARCH 18 ORDER; AND DENYING FIRST AMENDED PETITION re 65 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration of March 18, 2015 Order Or, in the Alternative, Motion to A lter and Amend the Judgment Pursuant to Rule 59(e) filed by Committee on Judicial Conduct and Disability of the Judicial Conference of the United States, 58 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration of March 18, 2015 Order filed by Cathy A. Catterson. The Court VACATES its March 18 Order and enters this new order DENYING the Petition. The parties shall submit a revised proposed form of judgment, agreed as to form within five business days of this Order.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/27/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2015)
|
April 23, 2015 |
Filing
71
ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 58 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration; granting 65 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2015)
|
March 18, 2015 |
Filing
53
ORDER GRANTING IN PART FIRST AMENDED PETITION AS TO PRESERVATION OF EMAILS ONLY re 1 Petition, filed by Indian People's Actions, Sara Plains Feather, Four Directions, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/18/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2015)
|
February 12, 2015 |
Filing
50
ORDER RE: MARCH 3, 2015 HEARING. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/12/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2015)
|
January 26, 2015 |
Filing
43
ORDER SETTING HEARING ON FIRST AMENDED PETITION AND MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED PETITION. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 35 MOTION to Dismiss.Parties briefs filed by Monday, 2/2/15. Replies due by 2/6/2015 by 12:00 noon. Motion Hearing on FAP and Motion to Dismiss set for Wednesday, 2/11/2015 02:00 PM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/26/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2015)
|
January 9, 2015 |
Filing
40
ORDER VACATING HEARING re 35 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Cathy A. Catterson, Committee on Judicial Conduct and Disability of the Judicial Conference of the United States. The hearing set for January 13, 2015 is VACATED. The Court will issue a written decision on the papers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/9/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2015)
|
October 28, 2014 |
Filing
32
ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 19 Motion to Dismiss Pre-Complaint Petition with Leave to Amend; ; granting 31 Stipulation for Extension; Continuing Case Management Conference. Terminating 30 Stipulation. Amended Petition filed 11/14/2014; Motion to Dismiss filed by 12/9/14. Case Management Conference set for 11/3/2014 is CONTINUED to 1/26/2015 at 2:00pm. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2014)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?