Plascencia-De Haro v. Holder et al
Plaintiff: Gloria Plascencia-De Haro
Defendant: Eric H. Holder, Jr., Jeh Johnson, Thomas S. Winkowski, Timothy Aiken, Leon Rodriguez, Mari Carmen Jordan and Jonathan Crawford
Case Number: 3:2014cv03058
Filed: July 4, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. ADOPTING 68 MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION RE 52 MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2017)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 8/16/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2016)
August 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING 22 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND REMANDING FOR FURTHER PROCEEDINGS; DENYING AS MOOT 26 MOTION TO STAY. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2016)
March 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting with prejudice as to the first cause of action in the FAC re: 22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. The parties are directed to appear for a Further Case Management Conference set for 3/22/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 3/11/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2016)
February 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 42 Stipulation Re 41 Order to Show Cause. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2016)
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 2/5/2016. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 1/26/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2016) Modified on 1/26/2016 to correct year on docket. (ndrS, COURT STAFF).
August 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 38 Stipulation re 37 Clerk's Notice. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2015)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. EXTENDING DEADLINE TO FILE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE 18 . (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Plascencia-De Haro v. Holder et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Plascencia-De Haro
Represented By: Kevin Michael Crabtree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric H. Holder, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeh Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas S. Winkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Aiken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leon Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mari Carmen Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?