Roche Molecular Systems, Inc. v. Cepheid

Plaintiff: Roche Molecular Systems, Inc.
Defendant: Cepheid
Case Number: 3:2014cv03228
Filed: July 16, 2014
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 2, 2016 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving Defendant's Notice of Withdrawal of Administrative Motion to File Under Seal signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2016)
June 21, 2016 79 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER for Jury Trial by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2016)
May 20, 2016 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Lifting Stay by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. A Further Case Management Conference is set for 6/14/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. An updated Case Management Statement is due by 6/7/2016. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2016)
May 4, 2016 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for Joint Status Update by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2016)
January 7, 2015 63 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Granting 43 Motion to Stay Litigation Pending Inter Partes Review of Patent-In-Suit and Granting 48 Motion to Seal by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte.(shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2015) Modified on 1/7/2015 (shyS, COURT STAFF).
November 21, 2014 45 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER for Jury Trial by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte.(shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roche Molecular Systems, Inc. v. Cepheid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roche Molecular Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Solomon Rabinowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cepheid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?