Cunningham v. Singer et al
Plaintiff: Archibald Cunningham
Defendant: Kevin Singer, John Scott McKay, Michael Coombs, Tamara Woods, Donald Evans Quidachay, Lillian Sing, Ming-Lee, T. Michael Yuen, Cantil Sakauye, Anthony Kline, James Richmond, Receiver Specialists and A. James Robertson, II
Case Number: 3:2014cv03250
Filed: July 18, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION by Hon. William Alsup [denying 137 Motion for Reconsideration]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2017)
December 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER DENYING 126 MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT FOR FRAUD ON THE COURT by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2016)
January 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 114 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/8/2015. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2015)
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 79 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 78 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2014)
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER RE DEADLINE TO MOVE FOR DISQUALIFICATION OF ASSIGNED JUDGE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/18/2014. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2014).
November 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 47 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 48 Ex Parte Application for a Temporary Restraining Order (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2014)
September 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 39 Motion to Continue; granting 43 Motion to Continue (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2014)
August 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 8/15/2014. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cunningham v. Singer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Archibald Cunningham
Represented By: Archibald Robert Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Singer
Represented By: Aron Mark Oliner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Scott McKay
Represented By: Linda H. Leong
Represented By: John Scott McKay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Coombs
Represented By: Linda H. Leong
Represented By: John Scott McKay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tamara Woods
Represented By: Linda H. Leong
Represented By: John Scott McKay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Evans Quidachay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lillian Sing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ming-Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Michael Yuen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cantil Sakauye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Kline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Richmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Receiver Specialists
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. James Robertson, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?