Gilbane Federal v. United Infrastructure Projects FZCO

Plaintiff: Gilbane Federal
Defendant: United Infrastructure Projects FZCO, United Infrastructure Projects SAL (Offshore) Lebanon and United Infrastructure Projects Djibouti SARL
Case Number: 3:2014cv03254
Filed: July 18, 2014
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 29, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 19 Ex Parte Application.(vclc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2014)
August 29, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria denying 22 Ex Parte Application.(vclc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2014)
September 24, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 22 Motion for Anti-Suit Injunction filed by Gilbane Federal. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 9/24/2014. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2014)
December 10, 2014 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RESETTING DATE FOR 53 MOTION Contempt Ruling . Responses due by 2/19/2015. Replies due by 2/23/2015. Motion Hearing set for 3/12/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 12/10/2014. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2014)
December 22, 2014 55 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER SETTING DATE FOR 53 MOTION Contempt Ruling filed by Gilbane Federal. Replies due by 2/27/2015. Motion Hearing set for 3/12/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 12/22/2014. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2014)
March 26, 2015 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria Setting aside default (dkt 42 ); denying 53 Motion for Contempt; denying 56 Motion for Default Judgment; finding as moot 65 Motion to Strike. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2015)
April 23, 2015 93 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 81 Motion for Pro Hac Vice- McHugh.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilbane Federal v. United Infrastructure Projects FZCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilbane Federal
Represented By: Bennett Jinchul Lee(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Nicholas Merrell(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Infrastructure Projects FZCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Infrastructure Projects SAL (Offshore) Lebanon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Infrastructure Projects Djibouti SARL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.