LiveCareer Ltd v. Su Jia Technolgies Ltd et al

Plaintiff: LiveCareer Ltd
Defendant: Su Jia Technologies Ltd., dba ResumeGenius.com and Resume Companion LLC
Case Number: 3:2014cv03336
Filed: July 23, 2014
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 20, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER NOTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING re 31 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Hearing (L.R. 7-7) filed by Resume Companion LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 20, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2014)
December 15, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE SU JIA TECHNOLOGIES LTD. by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 30 Motion FOR 60-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE SU JIA TECHNOLOGIES LTD. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2014)
December 15, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LIMITED JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY AND STAYING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR RESUME COMPANION'S PENDING MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 20 Motion for Discovery. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2014)
January 29, 2015 47 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 45 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re: Protective Order filed by Resume Companion LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 29, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2015)
March 31, 2015 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTIONS TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION AND MOTION TO TRANSFER by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying 42 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying 18 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2015)
March 31, 2015 60 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 5/20/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/3/2015 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Amended Pleadings due 7/10/2015. Fact Discovery due 3/11/2016. Expert Di sclosures due 4/1/2016. Expert Rebuttal due 4/22/2016. Expert Discovery due 5/6/2016. Dispositive Motions due 5/27/2016. Pretrial Conference Statement due 8/9/2016. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/19/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. Jury Trial set for 9/12/2016 - 9/22/2016 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 31, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LiveCareer Ltd v. Su Jia Technolgies Ltd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LiveCareer Ltd
Represented By: Ryan W. Koppelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Su Jia Technologies Ltd., dba ResumeGenius.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resume Companion LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.