Alexandra Polakovic v. Electronic Document Processing, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Alexandra Polakovic
Defendant: Electronic Document Processing, Inc and Prescott Woodford
Case Number: 3:2014cv03424
Filed: July 28, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER RE: JOINT NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT. STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL OR JOINT STATUS REPORT DUE 4/27/2015. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/27/2015. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2015)
March 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Granting in part, denying in part Attendance at Mediation. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/10/15. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2015)
March 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 22 Stipulation and Order allowing Filing of First Amended Complaint. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2015)
October 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING: 10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER INITIAL COMPLAINT, AND TO CONTINUE FRCP 26(f) AND ADR DEADLINES AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Alexandra Polakovic. Case Management Statement due by 12/4/2014. Case Management Conference set for 12/11/2014 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/10/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2014) (Entered: 10/14/2014) .
October 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING: 10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER INITIAL COMPLAINT, AND TO CONTINUE FRCP 26(f) AND ADR DEADLINES AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Alexandra Polakovic. Case Management Statement due by 12/4/2014. Case Management Conference set for 12/11/2014 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/10/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alexandra Polakovic v. Electronic Document Processing, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexandra Polakovic
Represented By: James Anthony Michel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electronic Document Processing, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prescott Woodford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?