In re Pacific Thomas Corporation
Plaintiff: Kyle Everett
Defendant: Randall Whitney, Pacific Trading Ventures, Pacific Trading Ventures, Ltd. and Jill V. Worsley
Case Number: 3:2014cv03465
Filed: July 31, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BAP)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER VACATING JUDGMENT OF BANKRUPTCY COURT; REMANDING FOR FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 4/20/18. (mmcalc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2018)
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 DECISION AFFIRMING JUDGMENT OF BANKRUPTCY COURT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 5/10/16. (mmcalc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2016)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER GRANTING SECOND ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONDENT'S BRIEF The time for filing the respondent's brief shall be extended a total of eleven (11) days, from March 20, 2015, to and including March 31, 2 015. The time for appellants to file their optional reply brief is also extended a corresponding eleven (11) days, so that this optional replybrief, presently due April 3, 2015, shall be due on April 14, 2015. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 19, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2015)
February 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER DIRECTING APPELLANTS TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPIES IN COMPLIANCE WITH DECEMBER 1, 2014 ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 4, 2015. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2015)
November 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSELPaul McCarthy is substituted as counsel for appellant Randall Whitney, who was formerly pro se. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 7, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re Pacific Thomas Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Everett
Represented By: Craig C. Chiang
Represented By: Robert E. Izmirian
Represented By: Ivo Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall Whitney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Trading Ventures
Represented By: Charles Alex Naegele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Trading Ventures, Ltd.
Represented By: Charles Alex Naegele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jill V. Worsley
Represented By: Charles Alex Naegele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?