Curry v. Yelp Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Joseph Curry
Defendant: Yelp Inc., Jeremy Stoppelman, Robert J. Krolik and Geoffrey Donaker
Case Number: 3:2014cv03547
Filed: August 6, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER RE: PROPOSED JUDGMENT re 72 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 8, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2015)
November 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting 59 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2015)
October 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 68 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 67 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing the October 29, 2015 Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint filed by Geoffrey Donaker, Yelp Inc., Robert J. Krolik, Jeremy Stoppelman. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 7, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2015)
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 65 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 64 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing the October 1, 2015 Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint to October 22, 2015 filed by Geoffrey Donaker, Yelp Inc., Robert J. Krolik, Jeremy Stoppelman. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 28, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2015)
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 58 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 57 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Establish Schedule for Briefing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Class Action Complaint and to Reset Initial Case Management Conference filed by Geo ffrey Donaker, Yelp Inc., Robert J. Krolik, Jeremy Stoppelman. Motion Hearing set for 9/10/2015 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 29, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2015)
May 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying 52 Motion for Leave to File. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2015)
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 34 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2015)
November 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 31 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Establishing Schedule for Plaintiffs to File a Consolidated Amended Complaint and for Briefing on Defendants' Anticipated Motion to Dismiss filed by City of Miami Fire Fighters' and Police Officers' Retirement Trust, Joseph Curry. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 21, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2014)
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER 1) CONSOLIDATING CASES 2) APPOINTING LEAD PLAINTIFF 3) APPOINTING LEAD COUNSEL by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting (19) Motion to Consolidate Cases; granting (19) Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ; granting (21) Motion to Consolidate Cases; denying (21) Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel in case 3:14-cv-03547-JST. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2014) Modified on 11/17/2014 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
November 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER VACATING HEARING re 19 MOTION to Consolidate Cases, MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by DRU L PIO. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 10, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2014)
November 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER VACATING MOTION HEARING re 21 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by City of Miami Fire Fighters' and Police Officers' Retirement Trust. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 4, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2014)
September 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO RELATE CASES re (12 in 3:14-cv-03547-JST) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Administrative Motion re: Related Cases; Local Rules 3-12(b); 7-11; filed by Geoffrey Donaker, Yelp Inc., Robert J. Krolik, Jeremy Stoppelman. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 22, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2014)
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 8 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue the Initial Case Management Conference, Reset Related Deadlines, and Extend Defendants' Time to Respond to the Complaint filed by Joseph Curry Case Management Statement due by 4/17/2015. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/29/2015 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 2, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curry v. Yelp Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Curry
Represented By: Nathan R. Hamler
Represented By: Frank James Johnson
Represented By: Darren Jay Robbins
Represented By: David Conrad Walton
Represented By: Shawn A. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yelp Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Stoppelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J. Krolik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geoffrey Donaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?