Ortega v. Barbasa et al
Plaintiff: Carlos A. Ortega
Defendant: Robert Barbasa and John Kelly Villagomez
Case Number: 3:2014cv03783
Filed: August 8, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Napa
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Presiding Judge: PSLC JNE
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 84 Stipulation. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2017)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 3/2/2017. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 2/23/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2017)
December 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 80 CONDITIONAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL. ***Civil Case Terminated.*** Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 12/27/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2016)
August 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 71 Stipulated Protective Order. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2016)
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Federal Pro Bono Project. Case reopened. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 4/6/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2016)
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Report of Pro Se Prisoner Early Settlement Proceeding. Matter not settled. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 3/30/2016. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortega v. Barbasa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos A. Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Barbasa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kelly Villagomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?