Liberty v. Smith et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Liberty
Defendant: Frederick W Smith, James L Barksdale, John A Edwardson, Shirley Ann Jackson, Steven R Loranger, Gary W Loveman, R. Brad Martin, Joshua Cooper Ramo, Susan C Schwab, David P Steiner, Paul S. Walsh and Fedex Corporation
Case Number: 3:2014cv03810
Filed: August 21, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting 47 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal and [Proposed] Order filed by David P Steiner, Frederick W Smith, Gary W Loveman, John A Edwardson, R. Brad Martin, Susan C Schwab, Shirley Ann Jackson, James L Barksdale, Steven R Loranger, Paul S. Walsh, Joshua Cooper Ramo and Nominal defendant FedEx Corporation. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/23/2016. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2016)
July 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER, granting 39 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation Requesting Status Conference and [Proposed] Order filed by David P Steiner, et al. Case Management Statement due by 8/12/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/19/2016 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/21/2016. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2016)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER STAYING CASE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 04/02/2015. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2015)
March 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 03/11/2015. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2015)
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting 23 Ex Parte Application Defendants' Ex Parte Application to Continue Hearing Date for Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Date for Initial Case Management Conference filed by David P Steiner, et al. Reset hearing a s to 17 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Shareholder Derivative Complaint ,. Motion Hearing and Initial Case Management Conference reset for 4/3/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/11/2015. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2015)
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting 10 STIPULATION To Set A Briefing Schedule and Page Limits for the Motion to Dismiss Briefing Papers. Motions due by 11/21/2014. Responses due by 1/9/2015. Replies due by 1/30/2015. Motion Hearing set for 2/20/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/17/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liberty v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Liberty
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Represented By: Nancy L. Fineman
Represented By: Mark Cotton Molumphy
Represented By: Bryan Marshall Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick W Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James L Barksdale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John A Edwardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirley Ann Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven R Loranger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary W Loveman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Brad Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Cooper Ramo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan C Schwab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David P Steiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul S. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fedex Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?