Auction Acceleration Corp. v. eBay Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Auction Acceleration Corp. |
Defendant: |
eBay Inc. and Auctiva Corporation |
Case Number: |
3:2014cv04045 |
Filed: |
September 5, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of California |
Office: |
San Francisco Office |
County: |
XX US, Outside State |
Presiding Judge: |
Laurel Beeler |
Nature of Suit: |
Patent |
Cause of Action: |
35 U.S.C. § 271 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 19, 2015 |
Filing
52
ORDER GRANTING (51 in 5:14-cv-04045-EJD, 49 in 5:14-cv-04046-EJD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Further Continue Case Management Conference Pending Settlement filed by Vendio Services, Inc. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/2/2015. Case Management Conference set for 7/9/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/19/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2015)
|
May 22, 2015 |
Filing
50
ORDER GRANTING (47 in 5:14-cv-04046-EJD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Further Continue Case Management Conference Pending Settlement filed by Vendio Services, Inc., (49 in 5:14-cv-04045-EJD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Further Continue Case Management Conference Pending Settlement filed by Auctiva Corporation. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/18/2015. Case Management Conference set for 6/25/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/22/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2015)
|
April 24, 2015 |
Filing
48
ORDER GRANTING (47 in 5:14-cv-04045-EJD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference Pending Settlement filed by Auctiva Corporation, (45 in 5:14-cv-04046-EJD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Contin ue Case Management Conference Pending Settlement filed by Vendio Services, Inc. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/21/2015. Case Management Conference set for 5/28/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/24/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2015)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?