Nitsch v. Dreamworks Animation SKG Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Robert A. Nitsch, Jr.
Defendant: Dreamworks Animation SKG Inc., Pixar, Lucasfilm Ltd. LLC, The Walt Disney Company, Digital Domain 3.0, Inc., ImageMovers, ImageMovers Digital, Sony Pictures Animation and Sony Pictures Imageworks
Movant: David Wentworth
Case Number: 3:2014cv04062
Filed: September 8, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 402 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh Granting in Part and Denying in Part (385) Motion for Attorney's Fees in case 5:14-cv-04062-LHK.Associated Cases: 5:14-cv-04062-LHK, 5:14-cv-04203-LHK, 5:14-cv-04422-LHK(lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2017)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 383 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 285 Non-Party Motion for Reimbursement; granting 307 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2017)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 382 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh Granting 358 Motion for Settlement.(lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2017)
November 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 349 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh Denying 339 Motion for Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge.(lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2016)
November 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 348 Final Judgment as to Defendants Sony Pictures Imageworks Inc., Sony Pictures Animation Inc., and Blue Sky Studios Inc. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/11/16. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/11/2016)
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 337 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 321 Discovery Dispute Joint Report No. 1. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2016)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 318 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on August 5, 2016. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2016)
May 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 291 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 215 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 239 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 253 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 269 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2016)
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART AND DENYING-IN-PART 203 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on May 25, 2016. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2016)
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 277 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on May 6, 2016. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2016)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 272 Questions for Hearing on Motion for Class Certification. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on May 2, 2016. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2016)
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 270 Questions Regarding Motion for Class Certification. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on April 29, 2016. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2016)
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO COMPEL. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on March 30, 2016, re 213 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2016)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART MOTION TO SEAL by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal, granting-in-part and denying-in-part 244 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2016)
March 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART MOTION TO COMPEL. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on March 23, 2016, granting-in-part and denying-in-part 213 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2016)
March 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SEAL by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting 220 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2016)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 198 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on January 21, 2016. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2016)
December 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER RE SEALING PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on December 14, 2015. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2015)
December 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 173 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on December 9, 2015. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2015)
August 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying 126 Motion to Dismiss (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2015)
July 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 146 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on July 8, 2015. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2015)
April 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 71 Motion to Compel (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2015)
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION REGARDING SEARCH TERM PROTOCOL by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal, granting 109 . Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 4/21/2015. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2015)
April 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 79 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2015)
December 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER denying as moot 59 & 60 . Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on December 9, 2014. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2014)
November 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on November 6, 2014. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2014)
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 9/24/14. (lhklc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2014)
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice- Small.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nitsch v. Dreamworks Animation SKG Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dreamworks Animation SKG Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pixar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucasfilm Ltd. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Walt Disney Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Digital Domain 3.0, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ImageMovers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ImageMovers Digital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Pictures Animation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Pictures Imageworks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert A. Nitsch, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey Benjamin Dubner
Represented By: Richard L. Grossman
Represented By: Brent W Johnson
Represented By: Matthew W Ruan
Represented By: Daniel A. Small
Represented By: Bruce Van Spiva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: David Wentworth
Represented By: Jeff D Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?