Powell v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage et al
Plaintiff: Kayode Powell
Defendant: WELLS FARGO HOME MORTGAGE, WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A., HSBC USA, N.A., as trustee for Wells Fargo Home Equity Asset Backed Certificates, Series 2005-4, FIRST AMERICAN LOANSTAR TRUSTEE SERVICES, a Texas corporation, FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY, DOE CREDIT REPORTING AGENCIES, NICOLE MILES-TODD, RECORDER PATRICK OCONNELL, JOHN KENNERTY, CHET SCONYEERS, Hank Duong and First American Trustee Servicing Solutions, LLC fka First American Loanstar Trustee Services, LLC
Case Number: 3:2014cv04248
Filed: September 19, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting 197 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney and referring parties to Judge Corley for a further settlement conference. As there is no indication that Plaintiff has retained new counsel, the motion is granted on the condition that Mercer shall continue to serve all papers on Powell for forwarding purposes until relieved of that duty by the Court. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2019)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 175 Discovery Order re: 172 Discovery Letter, 173 Discovery Letter. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 9/28/2018. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 168 Discovery Order re 167 Letter filed by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/28/2018. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2018)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 153 Stipulation (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2017)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting in part and denying in part 134 Motion to Strike. Fourth Amended Complaint due by 7/14/2017. Case Management Statement due by 9/14/2017. Case Management Conference set for 9/21/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco.(mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2017)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting 107 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 109 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 113 Motion for Leave to File. Amended Pleadings due by 3/24/2017. Case Ma nagement Statement due by 4/13/2017. Case Management Conference set for 4/20/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco. The parties shall attend a settlement conference before the Hon. Jacqueline Scott Corley. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2017)
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO ADR UNIT FOR ASSESSMENT TELEPHONE CONFERENCE; ORDER VACATING CMC AND MOTION HEARINGS. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/30/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Powell v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kayode Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WELLS FARGO HOME MORTGAGE
Represented By: Edward Rick Buell, III
Represented By: Mark Douglas Lonergan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.
Represented By: Edward Rick Buell, III
Represented By: Laszlo Ladi, Jr
Represented By: Mark Douglas Lonergan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC USA, N.A., as trustee for Wells Fargo Home Equity Asset Backed Certificates, Series 2005-4
Represented By: Edward Rick Buell, III
Represented By: Laszlo Ladi, Jr
Represented By: Mark Douglas Lonergan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIRST AMERICAN LOANSTAR TRUSTEE SERVICES, a Texas corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Josette Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOE CREDIT REPORTING AGENCIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NICOLE MILES-TODD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RECORDER PATRICK OCONNELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN KENNERTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHET SCONYEERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hank Duong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Trustee Servicing Solutions, LLC fka First American Loanstar Trustee Services, LLC
Represented By: Glenn Harlan Wechsler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?