Wynn et al v. Chanos
Plaintiff: Stephen Wynn and Wynn Resorts Limited
Defendant: James Chanos
Case Number: 3:2014cv04329
Filed: September 25, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER MODIFYING 78 ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 06/29/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2015)
June 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES re 66 Brief. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 06/19/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2015)
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 65 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/04/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2015)
March 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION TO STRIKE AND DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DISCOVERY by Judge William H. Orrick granting 52 Motion to Strike; granting 54 Motion to Dismiss; denying 60 Motion for Discovery. Chanos shall submit papers establishing attorney's fees and costs pursuant California Code of Civil Procedure § 425.16(c) on or before March 23, 2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2015)
January 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 45 STIPULATION - Case Management Conference continued to 3/24/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 3/17/2015. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/09/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2015)
December 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting 16 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice. If plaintiffs choose to amend their complaint, they must do so by January 13, 2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2014)
November 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER DENYING DISCOVERY PRIOR TO ANTI-SLAPP MOTION by Hon. William H. Orrick. The Court finds this matter suitable for decision without oral argument and VACATES the hearing set for November 5, 2014. Wynn's 21 Motion for Discovery is DENIED. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2014)
October 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting 18 STIPULATION permitting motion for pre-hearing discovery and extending response and reply dates related to 11 , 16 motions. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/24/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wynn et al v. Chanos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Wynn
Represented By: Lawrence M. Cirelli
Represented By: Barry Benson Langberg
Represented By: Mitchell Joel Langberg
Represented By: Megan Oliver-Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wynn Resorts Limited
Represented By: Lawrence M. Cirelli
Represented By: Barry Benson Langberg
Represented By: Mitchell Joel Langberg
Represented By: Megan Oliver-Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Chanos
Represented By: Kenneth G. Hausman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?