Camargo v. Miltiadous
Plaintiff: Carla Camargo
Defendant: Milton Miltiadous
Case Number: 3:2014cv04490
Filed: October 7, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 5/6/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2016)
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SANCTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 4/11/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2016)
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION. Show Cause Response due by 4/18/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 4/4/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2016)
January 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER FOR SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING RE: REQUEST FOR DEFAULT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 1/6/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2016)
November 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND TO APPEAR AT RESCHEDULED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 12/1/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/3/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 11/20/2015. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2015)
November 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley denying 24 Third Motion for Early Expedited Discovery (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2015)
July 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 9/24/2015. Case Management Conference set for 10/1/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 7/31/2015. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2015)
April 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 16 Motion to Expedite (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2015)
March 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley denying without prejudice 11 Ex Parte Application FOR LIMITED EXPEDITED DISCOVERY (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Camargo v. Miltiadous
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carla Camargo
Represented By: Amy Sommer Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milton Miltiadous
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?