The Universal Church, Inc.-V-Standard Construction Co. of S.F.
Plaintiff: The Universal Church, Inc.
Defendant: Standard Construction Company of San Francisco, Inc, Thomas M. Sestak and First Mercury Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2014cv04568
Filed: October 14, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER CONTINUING THE HEARING ON THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 4/21/2016 at 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/18/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2016)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 123 STANDBY ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 3/24/2016 at 01:30 PM. Show Cause Response due by 3/21/2016.Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/21/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2016)
January 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER REGARDING MOTIONS IN LIMINE AND DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR A CONTINUANCE. Signed by Judge Richard Seborg on 1/8/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2016)
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting 105 Motion to Shorten Time (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2016)
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 98 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Settlement Conference set for 1/15/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 1/4/2016. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2016)
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg denying 60 Motion for Summary Judgment. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2015)
October 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore regarding 57 Discovery Letter Brief.(kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2015)
May 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE ADR COMPLETION DEADLINE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/11/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2015)
February 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER, Case referred to mediation. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/6/2015 10:00 AM; Pretrial Conference set for 1/7/2016 10:00 AM; Jury Selection set for 2/1/2016 09:00 AM; Jury Trial set for 2/1/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/12/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Universal Church, Inc.-V-Standard Construction Co. of S.F.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Universal Church, Inc.
Represented By: David Alan Householder
Represented By: Steven S. Karic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Construction Company of San Francisco, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas M. Sestak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Mercury Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?