February 20, 2019 |
Filing
310
Proposed Phase I Verdict Form (wholc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2019)
|
November 15, 2017 |
Filing
164
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' 129 MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND DENYING DEFENDANTS' 136 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/19/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 12/12/2017. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/15/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2017)
|
August 1, 2017 |
Filing
150
ORDER granting 149 STIPULATION Requesting Continuance of Class Certification and Summary Judgment Hearing. Reset Deadlines as to 136 MOTION for Summary Judgment and 129 MOTION to Certify Class. Motion Hearing continued to 10/18/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/01/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2017)
|
July 13, 2017 |
Filing
147
ORDER FOR FURTHER EXTENSION OF CASE DEADLINES by Hon. William H. Orrick granting 146 Stipulation. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2017)
|
April 10, 2017 |
Filing
139
ORDER FOR FURTHER EXTENSION OF CASE DEADLINES re 138 STIPULATION - Reset Deadlines as to 136 MOTION for Summary Judgment and 129 MOTION to Certify Class. Response to Motion for summary judgment due by 7/7/2017. Reply to Motion to Certify C lass due 7/7/2017. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 8/7/2017. Motion Hearing set for 8/23/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/10/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2017)
|
February 2, 2017 |
Filing
133
ORDER FOR FURTHER EXTENSION OF CASE DEADLINES granting 132 STIPULATION. Reset Deadlines as to 129 MOTION to Certify Class: response due by 3/24/2017, reply due by 5/10/2017, and motion hearing set for 5/31/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick.Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 02/02/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2017)
|
December 11, 2015 |
Filing
92
STIPULATED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/11/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2015)
|
November 30, 2015 |
Filing
87
ORDER REQUIRING MEET AND CONFER SESSIONS CONCERNING DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/30/2015. Lead trial counsel shall file a Joint Report on December 7, 2015 by 2 pm. If all the problems have not been resolved, lead tri al counsel shall meet in person from 9:30 am to 12:30 pm in the Attorney's Lounge on the 18th floor of this courthouse on December 8, 2015 to attempt to narrow the issues further. I will then hear argument on any unresolved matters at the end of the Case Management Conference calendar that commences at 2 pm December 8, 2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2015)
|
October 30, 2015 |
Filing
84
ORDER granting 83 STIPULATION on Case Management Conference Date. Case Management Conference continued to 12/8/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 12/1/2015. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/30/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2015)
|
August 18, 2015 |
Filing
78
ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS AND GRANTING MOTION TO APPOINT CLASS COUNSEL by Judge William H. Orrick denying 59 Motion to Dismiss; granting 60 Motion to Appoint Interim Class Counsel; granting 77 Motion to Strike. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2015)
|
May 22, 2015 |
Filing
68
STIPULATION AND ORDER ON ARGUMENT DATE - Motion Hearing as to 59 MOTION to Dismiss and 60 MOTION to Appoint Counsel set for 7/16/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/22/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2015)
|
March 10, 2015 |
Filing
54
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO DISMISS by Hon. William H. Orrick granting in part and denying in part 39 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs' claims that Bayer is making illegal disease claims by using the Statements " supports heart health" and "supports immunity" are preempted and DISMISSED. Plaintiffs are GRANTED LEAVE TO AMEND. The motion to dismiss is DENIED as to plaintiffs' claims regarding "supports physical energy." Plaintiffs' amended complaint shall be filed within 20 days of the date of this Order. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2015)
|
December 22, 2014 |
Filing
38
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 37 STIPULATION ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULING. Case Management Conference continued to 2/25/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 2/18/2015. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/22/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2014)
|