Gingold v. Novartis Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Robin Gingold
Defendant: Novartis Corporation, Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation and Sandoz Inc.
Case Number: 3:2014cv04635
Filed: October 16, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST TO DISMISS CASE by Hon. William Alsup granting 21 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2015)
January 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, re 8 STIPULATION. Case Management Statement due by 1/15/2015 at noon. Case Management Conference set for 1/29/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 8, 2015. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2015)
December 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. re 6 STIPULATION. Case Management Statement due by 1/15/2015 at noon. Responses due by 1/14/2015 at noon. Case Management Conference set for 1/22/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 12, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gingold v. Novartis Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Gingold
Represented By: Thomas E. Duckworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoz Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?