Wilson v. Florida Department of Revenue et al
Plaintiff: Michael Geary Wilson
Defendant: Brian Earl Watson, Jessica Elizabeth Buss, Adan Cardenas, Jr., Ronald Hoekwater, Lisa O'Connor, Jason Watkins, Diane Ott, Alta Risk, Rockhill Insurance Group, Zeiph Burley, Jarred Pereira, Robert E. Roundtree, Jr., Alameda County Superior Court, Martha Ann Lott, Frederick D. Smith, Jillian Fore-Hubbard, Lisa Zeeb-Johnson, Tara Ronzone, Terry Younghanz, Nancy Terrel, Rodney Dayley, Marilyn Ann Moffitt, Janet Caggiano, Anita L. Santos, Derek Murdock, William E. Davis, Linda D. Linnell, County of Alachua, Florida, Charlene Perry, Mary Jarvis, Benjamin M. Wood, California Health and Human Services, Delia Trevino, Benna Young, Steve Evans, Melinda Rene Self, Kelly Wayne Challand, Eighth Judicial Circuit of Flroida for the County of Alachua, Toby S. Monaco, Chad Alan Smith, Veronica I. Clements, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., Darby Fitzgerald Hertz, Eric Michael Mcquoid, Florida Department of Revenue, Koss-Olinger & Company, LLC, David Stanwood, David Margulies, County of Alameda, Joseph Ladner, Rachael Irene Zeiph Burley, Linda M. Dippel, Carlos Francies, Pete Briggette, Cathryn Green, Jill C. Fannin, Anthony Piscitelli, Jami Caroline Wilson, Tom Crayne, David L. Nyburg, Teri Branco, Contra Costa County Superior Court, Jon R. Rolefson, Jonathan Ortega, Darrell Brown, Steven K. Austin, Shannon Stone, Tanya Chappell, Tish Reyes, Barry P. Goode, Brian S. Vanderlind, Daniel Wedemeyer, Charles Prandi, Shannon Younghanz, Watson Realty Corp., Liza Tantoco, Will Olinger, Ronald Earl Watson, Daryl Parham, Richard T. Parks, Hertz & Kearns, Cheryl Shavers and County of Contra Costa
Case Number: 3:2014cv04726
Filed: October 24, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on May 2, 2016. (jcslc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2016)
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE; AND VACATING MAY 6, 2016 MOTION HEARING. Plaintiff shall file a response to the Order to Show Cause, not to exceed 5 pages, by May 2, 2016. Failure to comply with this Order may result in dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on April 19, 2016. (jcslc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2016)
April 1, 2016 Filing 52 Request for Judicial Notice re #51 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed byAdan Cardenas, Jr, County of Contra Costa, Linda M. Dippel, Linda D. Linnell, Melinda Rene Self. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #51 ) (Baker, D.) (Filed on 4/1/2016)
April 1, 2016 Filing 51 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Adan Cardenas, Jr, County of Contra Costa, Linda M. Dippel, Linda D. Linnell, Melinda Rene Self. Motion Hearing set for 5/6/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Responses due by 4/15/2016. Replies due by 4/22/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Baker, D.) (Filed on 4/1/2016)
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER DISMISSING FIRST AMENDMENT CLAIM WITH PREJUDICE. Amended Complaint due by 3/17/2016. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/17/16. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2016)
February 12, 2016 Filing 49 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Case Management Conference held on 2/12/2016.Court dismissed the First Amendment Claim with prejudice on the basis that Plaintiff did not file an amended complaint.As to the due process claim, the STAY is lifted.Plaintiff shall have thirty (30) days in which he may amend solely to add allegations regarding recent developments in the state court action relevant to his due process claim.FTR Time Not Reported. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/12/2016)
February 5, 2016 Filing 48 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT OF DEFENDANTS COUNTY OF CONTRA COSTA, LINDA DIPPEL, MELINDA SELF, LINDA LINNELL AND ADAN CARDENAS JR. filed by Adan Cardenas, Jr, County of Contra Costa, Linda M. Dippel, Linda D. Linnell, Melinda Rene Self. (Attachments: #1 Declaration OF D. CAMERON BAKER)(Baker, D.) (Filed on 2/5/2016)
January 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER GRANTING re #46 Notice (Other)/Admin. Motion Requesting Case Management Conference filed by County of Contra Costa, Adan Cardenas, Jr., Linda M. Dippel, Linda D. Linnell, Melinda Rene Self. Case Management Conference set for 2/12/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/13/16. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2016)
January 8, 2016 Filing 46 NOTICE by Adan Cardenas, Jr, County of Contra Costa, Linda M. Dippel, Linda D. Linnell, Melinda Rene Self NOTIFICATION OF SUPERIOR COURT ORDERS AND ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION REQUESTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Baker, D.) (Filed on 1/8/2016)
August 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #36 Motion to Dismiss as to First Amendment Claims with Leave to Amend, Staying Due Process Claims Pending Resolution of State Court Proceedings and Vacating August 21, 2015 hearing (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2015)
August 13, 2015 Filing 44 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Adan Cardenas, Jr, County of Contra Costa, Linda M. Dippel, Linda D. Linnell, Melinda Rene Self.. (Baker, D.) (Filed on 8/13/2015)
August 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER of USCA as to #24 Notice of Appeal, filed by Michael Geary Wilson. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2015)
August 6, 2015 Filing 42 Request for Judicial Notice re #40 Reply to Opposition/Response SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE BY DEFENDANTS COUNTY OF CONTRA COSTA, LINDA DIPPEL, MELINDA SELF, LINDA LINNELL AND ADAN CARDENAS filed byLinda M. Dippel, Linda D. Linnell, Melinda Rene Self. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #40 ) (Baker, D.) (Filed on 8/6/2015)
August 6, 2015 Filing 41 Declaration of D. CAMERON BAKER in Support of #40 Reply to Opposition/Response SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF D. CAMERON BAKER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANTS COUNTY OF CONTRA COSTA, LINDA DIPPEL, MELINDA SELF, LINDA LINNELL AND ADAN CARDENAS filed byAdan Cardenas, Jr, County of Contra Costa, Linda M. Dippel, Linda D. Linnell, Melinda Rene Self. (Related document(s) #40 ) (Baker, D.) (Filed on 8/6/2015)
August 6, 2015 Filing 40 REPLY (re #36 MOTION to Dismiss SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT ) filed byAdan Cardenas, Jr, County of Contra Costa, Linda M. Dippel, Linda D. Linnell, Melinda Rene Self. (Baker, D.) (Filed on 8/6/2015)
July 16, 2015 Filing 39 Request for Judicial Notice re #38 Declaration in Support, #37 Declaration in Support, #36 MOTION to Dismiss SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed byAdan Cardenas, Jr, County of Contra Costa, Linda M. Dippel, Linda D. Linnell, Melinda Rene Self. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #38 , #37 , #36 ) (Baker, D.) (Filed on 7/16/2015)
July 16, 2015 Filing 38 Declaration of D. Cameron Baker in Support of #37 Declaration in Support, #36 MOTION to Dismiss SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed byAdan Cardenas, Jr, County of Contra Costa, Linda M. Dippel, Linda D. Linnell, Melinda Rene Self. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B PT 1, #3 Exhibit B PT 2, #4 Exhibit B PT 3, #5 Exhibit B PT 4, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #37 , #36 ) (Baker, D.) (Filed on 7/16/2015)
July 16, 2015 Filing 37 Declaration of Linda Linnell in Support of #36 MOTION to Dismiss SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed byAdan Cardenas, Jr, County of Contra Costa, Linda M. Dippel, Linda D. Linnell, Melinda Rene Self. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #36 ) (Baker, D.) (Filed on 7/16/2015)
July 16, 2015 Filing 36 MOTION to Dismiss SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Adan Cardenas, Jr, County of Contra Costa, Linda M. Dippel, Linda D. Linnell, Melinda Rene Self. Motion Hearing set for 8/21/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Responses due by 7/30/2015. Replies due by 8/6/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Baker, D.) (Filed on 7/16/2015)
June 25, 2015 Filing 35 SUMMONS Returned Executed County of Contra Costa served on 6/25/2015, answer due 7/16/2015. (Attachments: #1 Contra Costa County Counsel) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2015)
June 25, 2015 Filing 34 SUMMONS Returned Executed Adan Cardenas, Jr served on 6/25/2015, answer due 7/16/2015. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2015)
June 25, 2015 Filing 33 SUMMONS Returned Executed Linda D. Linnell served on 6/25/2015, answer due 7/16/2015. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2015)
June 25, 2015 Filing 32 SUMMONS Returned Executed Melinda Rene Self served on 6/25/2015, answer due 7/16/2015. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2015)
June 25, 2015 Filing 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed Linda M. Dippel served on 6/25/2015, answer due 7/16/2015. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2015)
June 23, 2015 Filing 30 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Receipt by US Marshals Service re #29 Summons Issued. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2015)
June 17, 2015 Filing 29 Summons Issued as to Adan Cardenas, Jr, County of Contra Costa, Linda M. Dippel, Linda D. Linnell, Melinda Rene Self. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2015)
June 15, 2015 Filing 28 USCA Case Number 15-16164 for #24 Notice of Appeal, filed by Michael Geary Wilson. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2015)
June 10, 2015 Filing 27 NOTICE by Michael Geary Wilson re #24 Notice of Appeal, MEDIATION QUESTIONNAIRE (Wilson, Michael) (Filed on 6/10/2015)
June 10, 2015 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Michael Geary Wilson. Appeal of Order, #23 (IFP Request was previously e-filed with the Court). CORRECTION: IFP Request was previously filed in person with the Court and GRANTED (Wilson, Michael) (Filed on 6/10/2015)
June 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Granting In Part and Denying In Part re #25 Request for Accommodations filed by Michael Geary Wilson. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/9/15. ***FILED UNDER SEAL*** (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2015) (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
June 9, 2015 Filing 25 REQUEST for Accommodations by person with disabilities by Michael Geary Wilson. ***FILED UNDER SEAL*** (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2015) (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
June 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER REVIEWING SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1915, DISMISSING IN PART AND ORDERING SERVICE ON DEFENDANTS DIPPEL, LINNELL, SELF, CARDENAS and the COUNTY OF CONTRA COSTA. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on June 9, 2015. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2015)
March 6, 2015 Filing 22 NOTICE by Michael Geary Wilson re #20 Amended Complaint , Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of the Summons to Residential Address of Defendant Kelly Wayne Challand (Attachments: #1 Summons Information Regarding Repeated Attempts to Locate and Request Waiver of Service of the Summons on Defendant Kelly Wayne Challand)(Wilson, Michael) (Filed on 3/6/2015)
March 1, 2015 Filing 21 NOTICE by Michael Geary Wilson re #20 Amended Complaint and Other Initiating Documents (Attachments: #1 List of Defendants and Relevant Non-Parties Noticed and Documents Sent)(Wilson, Michael) (Filed on 3/1/2015)
February 14, 2015 Filing 20 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed by Michael Geary Wilson. (Wilson, Michael) (Filed on 2/14/2015) Modified on 2/17/2015 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
February 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order, signed 2/11/15, by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2015)
February 9, 2015 Filing 18 Proposed Order re #17 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #16 Order on Motion to Expedite, by Michael Geary Wilson. (Wilson, Michael) (Filed on 2/9/2015)
February 9, 2015 Filing 17 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #16 Order on Motion to Expedite, filed by Michael Geary Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Wilson, Michael) (Filed on 2/9/2015)
January 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero Dismissing Amended Complaint Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. s 1915 with Leave to Amend, vacating Case Management Conference set for January 23, 2015 at 2:00 p.m. and denying #15 Motion to Expedite as moot (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2015)
November 17, 2014 Filing 15 Emergency MOTION to Expedite REVIEW OF PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT UNDER 1915(E)(2)(B) filed by Michael Geary Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order GRANTING PLAINTIFFS EMERGENCY EX PARTE MOTION TO EXPEDITE review of Plaintiffs complaint under 1915(e)(2)(B))(Wilson, Michael) (Filed on 11/17/2014)
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero denying #12 Ex Parte Application for Service without prejudice and vacating responsive deadlines pending Court's review of complaint under 28 USC 1915(e) (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/17/2014: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (klhS, COURT STAFF).
November 15, 2014 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to MONIKA COOPER; LINDA M. DIPPEL; MELINDA RENE SELF; LINDA LINNELL; ADAN CARDENAS JR. on 11/10/2014 by Michael Geary Wilson. ALL INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANTS (AND REPRESENTATIVE OF DEFENDANT COUNTY OF CONTRA COSTA, WHO IS MONICA COOPER) Waiver of Service due by 12/10/2014. (Wilson, Michael) (Filed on 11/15/2014)
November 14, 2014 Filing 12 Ex Parte Ex Parte Application re #9 Amended Complaint Ex Parte Motion for Service of Summons and Related Documents On Monell Defendants by USMS filed by Michael Geary Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Ex Parte Motion for Service of Summons and Related Documents On Monell Defendants by USMS)(Wilson, Michael) (Filed on 11/14/2014)
November 14, 2014 Filing 11 NOTICE by Michael Geary Wilson Singed, Sealed and Issued Summons (Wilson, Michael) (Filed on 11/14/2014)
November 12, 2014 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to California Health and Human Services, Adan Cardenas, Jr, County of Contra Costa, Linda M. Dippel, Florida Department of Revenue, Linda D. Linnell, Melinda Rene Self. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2014)
November 10, 2014 Filing 9 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; Jury Trial Demanded against All Defendants. Filed by Michael Geary Wilson. (Wilson, Michael) (Filed on 11/10/2014) Modified on 11/12/2014 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
November 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER, signed 11/6/14, by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #7 Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2014)
November 5, 2014 Filing 7 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing filed by Michael Geary Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2014)
November 5, 2014 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Michael Geary Wilson.. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2014)
November 3, 2014 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge within 14 days of this notice. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2014)
October 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/3/2014: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (klhS, COURT STAFF).
October 24, 2014 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/16/2015. Case Management Conference set for 1/23/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2014)
October 24, 2014 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Michael Geary Wilson. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2014)
October 24, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT; Jury Trial Demanded against California Health and Human Services Agency, Florida Department of Revenue (Filing fee IFPP). Filed by Michael Geary Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Florida Department of Revenue et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Earl Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Elizabeth Buss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adan Cardenas, Jr.
Represented By: D. Cameron Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Hoekwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Ott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alta Risk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockhill Insurance Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zeiph Burley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jarred Pereira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert E. Roundtree, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alameda County Superior Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha Ann Lott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jillian Fore-Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Zeeb-Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tara Ronzone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Younghanz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Terrel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney Dayley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marilyn Ann Moffitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Caggiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anita L. Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek Murdock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda D. Linnell
Represented By: D. Cameron Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Alachua, Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlene Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Jarvis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin M. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delia Trevino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benna Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melinda Rene Self
Represented By: D. Cameron Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Wayne Challand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eighth Judicial Circuit of Flroida for the County of Alachua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toby S. Monaco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Alan Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veronica I. Clements
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darby Fitzgerald Hertz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Michael Mcquoid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida Department of Revenue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koss-Olinger & Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Stanwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Margulies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Alameda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Ladner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachael Irene Zeiph Burley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda M. Dippel
Represented By: D. Cameron Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Francies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pete Briggette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathryn Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jill C. Fannin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Piscitelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jami Caroline Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Crayne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David L. Nyburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teri Branco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contra Costa County Superior Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon R. Rolefson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrell Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven K. Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tanya Chappell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tish Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry P. Goode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian S. Vanderlind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Wedemeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Prandi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Younghanz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Realty Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liza Tantoco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Will Olinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Earl Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daryl Parham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard T. Parks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hertz & Kearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl Shavers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Contra Costa
Represented By: D. Cameron Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Geary Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?