Hochstetler et al v. Pacific Gateway Concessions LLC
Plaintiff: Rachel Hochstetler and Cirena Torres
Defendant: Pacific Gateway Concessions LLC
Case Number: 3:2014cv04748
Filed: October 24, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER Amending 57 Settlement Agreement re: Cy Pres Recipient. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 8/1/17. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2017)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER Setting Status Conference. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 6/20/17. Status Conference set for 7/24/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Thelton E. Henderson. (tehlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2017)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER re: Cy Pres Recipient Letter Dated May 4, 2017. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 5/16/17. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2017)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Re: Cy Pres Recipient Letter. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 4/5/17. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2017)
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Granting Motions for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement, Award of Attorneys Fees and Costs, and Incentive Payments. Signed by Hon. Thelton E. Henderson on 06/07/16. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2016)
February 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Granting Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement and Scheduling Fairness Hearing for 6/6/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Signed by Hon. Thelton E. Henderson on 02/02/16. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2016)
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 10/19/2015. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/26/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/25/2015. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2015)
June 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Initial Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 8/24/2015. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/31/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 06/10/2015. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2015)
April 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 6/8/2015. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/15/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/06/2015. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2015)
January 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Initial Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 4/6/2015. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/13/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/08/2015. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hochstetler et al v. Pacific Gateway Concessions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Hochstetler
Represented By: Chant Yedalian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cirena Torres
Represented By: Chant Yedalian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Gateway Concessions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?