Verhoek v. U.S. Bank National Association et al
Plaintiff: |
Christina Verhoek |
Defendant: |
U.S. Bank National Association and U.S. Bank Home Mortgage |
Case Number: |
3:2014cv04821 |
Filed: |
October 30, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of California |
Office: |
San Francisco Office |
County: |
Contra Costa |
Presiding Judge: |
Edward M. Chen |
Nature of Suit: |
Foreclosure |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 28, 2015 |
Filing
47
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 46 of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/28/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2015)
|
June 15, 2015 |
Filing
44
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 43 Notice (Other), filed by U.S. Bank National Association, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 43 Notice (Other), 35 MOTION to Dismiss First Anded Complaint. Responses due by 8/13/2015. Replies due by 8/20/2 015. Motion Hearing set for 9/3/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Case Management Statement due by 9/24/2015. Case Management Conference set for 10/1/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/15/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2015)
|
May 4, 2015 |
Filing
41
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 37 Request and Stipulation to Continue Briefing Dates on Defendant US Bank N.A.'s Motion to Dismiss to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and to Continue the Case Management Conference filed by U.S. Ba nk National Association. Responses due by 6/11/2015. Replies due by 6/18/2015. Motion Hearing set for 7/2/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Case Management Statement due by 7/30/2015. Case Management Conference reset for 8/6/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/4/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2015)
|
March 25, 2015 |
Filing
34
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 33 Stipulation, filed by U.S. Bank National Association Case Management Statement due by 4/30/2015. Case Management Conference set for 5/7/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/25/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2015)
|
March 5, 2015 |
Filing
31
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 30 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Christina Verhoek. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/5/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2015)
|
November 12, 2014 |
Filing
17
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 15 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 12 MOTION to Dismiss REQUEST AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING DATE FOR DEFENDANT US BANK N.A.'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT filed by U.S. Bank Home Mortgage, U.S. Bank National Association, Responses due by 1/8/2015. Replies due by 1/15/2015. Motion Hearing reset for 1/29/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/12/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2014)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?