August 3, 2017 |
Filing
297
JUDGMENT by Hon. William Alsup granting 279 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2017)
|
June 22, 2017 |
Filing
295
NOTICE REGARDING JUDGMENT Signed by Judge Alsup on 6/22/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2017)
|
June 15, 2017 |
Filing
293
NOTICE REGARDING OPT-IN PLAINTIFF CARLOS MENDOZA Signed by Judge Alsup on 6/15/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2017)
|
June 7, 2017 |
Filing
291
ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO OPT OUT re 280 Order to Show Cause, 278 Statement filed by Juan Saravia Signed by Judge Alsup on 6/7/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2017)
|
May 25, 2017 |
Filing
284
ORDER RE OPT-IN PLAINTIFF QUANG NGUYEN re 280 Order to Show Cause Signed by Judge Alsup on 5/25/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2017)
|
May 11, 2017 |
Filing
282
ORDER RE OPT-IN PLAINTIFF CARLOS MENDOZA re 278 Statement filed by Juan Saravia Signed by Judge Alsup on 5/11/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2017)
|
April 24, 2017 |
Filing
277
ORDER RE CERTAIN PLAINTIFFS' DONATIONS TO CY PRES BENEFICIARIES by Hon. William Alsup granting 276 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2017)
|
April 7, 2017 |
Filing
275
ORDER AWARDING REASONABLE ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 262 Motion for Attorney Fees.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2017)
|
February 22, 2017 |
Filing
269
ORDER RE OBJECTION FILED WITH COURT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/22/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2017)
|
January 31, 2017 |
Filing
263
ORDER GRANTING SEALING MOTIONS by Judge Alsup granting 161 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 214 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 220 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 225 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2017)
|
January 4, 2017 |
Filing
257
ORDER APPROVING PROPOSED CODICIL (AS AMENDED) AND APPROVING PROPOSED NOTICE (AS AMENDED). Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/4/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2017)
|
January 3, 2017 |
Filing
255
NOTICE RE COURT'S VIEW OF DISPUTED TERM. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/3/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2017)
|
December 27, 2016 |
Filing
249
ORDER RE SETTLEMENT SCHEDULE by Hon. William Alsup granting 247 Stipulation. Motions due by 1/26/2017. Forfeiture Hearing set for 4/6/2017 01:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2016)
|
December 21, 2016 |
Filing
240
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULE FOR PRELIMINARY REVIEW OF SETTLEMENT Fairness Hearing set for 12/23/2016 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/21/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2016)
|
December 19, 2016 |
Filing
239
ORDER MOVING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/3/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/19/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2016)
|
December 4, 2016 |
Filing
235
ORDER RE CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Alsup denying 213 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 215 Motion for Summary Judgment. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2016)
|
November 28, 2016 |
Filing
231
ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 230 Motion to Strike.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2016)
|
November 10, 2016 |
Filing
222
ORDER SETTING HEARING ON CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 215 213 . Motion Hearing set for 11/30/2016 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/10/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2016)
|
November 7, 2016 |
Filing
218
REQUEST FOR RESPONSE RE HEARING ON CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/7/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2016)
|
October 14, 2016 |
Filing
212
ORDER FOR NON-SUBSTANTIVE MODIFICATION OF ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS CERTAIN OPT-IN PLAINTIFFS by Hon. William Alsup granting 211 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2016)
|
October 6, 2016 |
Filing
209
ORDER APPROVING PROPOSED NOTICE re [205-1]. Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/6/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2016) Modified on 10/6/2016 (ecgS, COURT STAFF).
|
September 30, 2016 |
Filing
206
ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS CERTAIN OPT-IN PLAINTIFFS by Judge Alsup granting 172 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 173 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 181 Motion to Dismiss. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2016)
|
August 4, 2016 |
Filing
171
ORDER RE MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF TAX RECORDS by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 160 Motion to Compel.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2016)
|
July 20, 2016 |
Filing
159
NOTICE RE DECERTIFICATION MOTION. Signed by Judge Alsup on 7/20/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2016)
|
July 19, 2016 |
Filing
157
ORDER POSTPONING EVIDENTIARY HEARING by Hon. William Alsup granting 152 Administrative Motion to postpone evidentiary hearing..(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2016)
|
July 18, 2016 |
Filing
153
NOTICE RE INTERPRETERS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 7/18/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2016)
|
June 23, 2016 |
Filing
140
ORDER RE DISCOVERY DISPUTES HEARING. Response due by NOON on 6/27/2016. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 6/23/2016. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2016)
|
June 22, 2016 |
Filing
139
ORDER DENYING EXTENSION OF DISCOVERY DEADLINE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 6/22/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2016)
|
June 20, 2016 |
Filing
135
ORDER SETTING HEARING RE PLAINTIFFS' FURTHER DISCOVERY DISPUTE [re 133 Discovery Letter BriefRegarding Plaintiffs Fourth Set of Requests for Production of Documents filed by Juan Saravia]. Response due by NOON on 6/28/2016. T hree-hour meet-and-confer from 7:30 AM--10:30 AM Friday, 7/1/2016 in Court's jury room. Discovery Hearing set for 7/1/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 6/20/2016. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2016)
|
June 7, 2016 |
Filing
124
ORDER SETTING HEARING RE PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY DISPUTE [re 122 Letter, filed by Juan Saravia]. Response due by 6/13/2016 9:00 AM. Two-hour meet-and-confer in Court's jury room from 8:30 AM--10:30 AM 6/15/2016. Discovery Hearing set for 6/15/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 6/7/2016. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2016)
|
June 2, 2016 |
Filing
121
ORDER SETTING HEARING RE DEFENDANTS' DISCOVERY DISPUTE [re 119 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Dynamex, Inc., 120 Declaration in Support, filed by Dynamex, Inc.]. Response due by 9:00 AM 6/6/2016. Three-hour meet-and-confer in C ourt's jury room starting from 8:00 AM--11:00 AM on 6/8/2016. Discovery Hearing set for 6/8/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 6/2/2016. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2016)
|
January 25, 2016 |
Filing
106
ORDER SETTING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, Case Management Statement due by 2/4/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/11/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/25/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2016)
|
January 7, 2016 |
Filing
104
STIPULATION AND ORDER RE INCLUSION OF ON DEMAND DRIVERS IN CONDITIONALLY CERTIFIED COLLECTIVE ACTION re 103 filed by Juan Saravia Distribution of Notice due by 1/18/2016.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/7/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2016)
|
December 8, 2015 |
Filing
102
ORDER RE SUPPLEMENT TO JOINT PLAN FOR DISTRIBUTION OF NOTICE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/8/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2015)
|
November 12, 2015 |
Filing
99
ORDER RE TRANSPORTATION WORKERS EXEMPTION. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/12/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2015)
|
October 22, 2015 |
Filing
91
REQUEST FOR BRIEFING RE TRANSPORTATION WORKERS EXEMPTION TO THE FEDERAL ARBITRATION ACT Responses due by 10/27/2015 at NOON.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/22/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2015)
|
October 21, 2015 |
Filing
90
ORDER RE BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON DEFENDANTS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Responses due by 10/26/2015.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/21/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2015)
|
October 19, 2015 |
Filing
88
ORDER APPROVING PROPOSED FORM OF NOTICE re 87 Statement, filed by Juan Saravia. Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/19/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2015)
|
October 6, 2015 |
Filing
86
ORDER RE DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CONDITIONALLY CERTIFY COLLECTIVE ACTION by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 56 Motion to Certify Class; denying 36 motion to compel arbitration.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2015)
|
August 24, 2015 |
Filing
81
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT AND SEEKING FURTHER SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING Responses due by 9/2/2015 at noon.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/24/15. (whalc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2015)
|
June 19, 2015 |
Filing
60
ORDER RE LIMITED DISCOVERY AND CONTINUING HEARINGLimited Discovery and Supplemental Briefing due by 7/30/2015 at NOON. Motion Hearing on 7/9/2015 continued to 8/27/2015 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 6/19/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2015)
|
May 27, 2015 |
Filing
52
Order re JOINT STIPULATION MEMORIALIZING AGREEMENT REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' DISCOVERY DISPUTEPURSUANT TO COURT'S ORDERFOLLOWING DISCOVERY HEARING by Hon. William Alsup granting 50 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2015)
|
May 21, 2015 |
Filing
48
ORDER FOLLOWING THE MAY 21 DISCOVERY HEARING re 41 Discovery Letter. Joint Stipulation due by 5/26/2015 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 21, 2015. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2015)
|
May 19, 2015 |
Filing
46
ORDER DENYING MOTION TO CONTINUE DEADLINES RE FLSA MOTION AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Hon. William Alsup denying 37 Motion to Continue.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2015)
|
May 15, 2015 |
Filing
42
ORDER SETTING MAY 21 DISCOVERY HEARING re 41 Discovery Letter. Response due by 5/19/2015 at noon. Declaration and response to 37 Motion to Continue due by 5/18/2015 at noon. Three-hour meet-and-confer from 7:30 a.m. continuing until 10:30 a.m. Discovery Hearing set for 5/21/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 15, 2015. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2015)
|
May 12, 2015 |
Filing
40
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER SUBJECT TO STATED CONDITIONS by Hon. William Alsup re 39 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2015)
|
February 17, 2015 |
Filing
14
SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 13 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2015)
|
February 2, 2015 |
Filing
11
NOTICE REGARDING FACTORS TO BE EVALUATED FOR ANY PROPOSED CLASS SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 2, 2015. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2015)
|