Arketha Munir v. Bank of America , N.A. et al
Plaintiff: |
Arketha Munir |
Defendant: |
Bank of America , N.A., Nationstar Mortgage, The Bank of New York Mellon, CTC Real Estate Services, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. and ReconTrust Company, N.A. |
Case Number: |
3:2014cv05073 |
Filed: |
November 17, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of California |
Office: |
Oakland Office |
County: |
San Francisco |
Presiding Judge: |
Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers |
Nature of Suit: |
All Other Real Property |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. § 1640 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 12, 2015 |
Filing
40
JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL, ***Civil Case Terminated.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/12/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2015)
|
May 22, 2015 |
Filing
38
ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 17 Motion to Dismiss Without Leave to Amend (ygrlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2015)
|
May 8, 2015 |
Filing
37
ORDER VACATING HEARING AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The hearing set for May 12, 2015 is VACATED. The Court also VACATES the Case Management Conference set for May 12, 2015, pending a ruling on the motion to dismiss., ***Deadlines terminated 36 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/8/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2015)
|
May 5, 2015 |
Filing
35
ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF CERTAIN DEFENDANTS re 32 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Arketha Munir. Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. and Nationstar Mortgage terminated.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/5/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2015)
|
April 30, 2015 |
Filing
30
ORDER CONTINUING HEARING; REQUIRING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 23 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 12(b)(6), 17 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff' s First Amended Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 5/5/15 is CONTINUED to 5/12/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Plaintiff response by Tuesday, 5/5/15 at noon; Defendants Statement filed 5/5/15 at Noon.Requests for telephonic appearances are DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/30/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2015)
|
March 12, 2015 |
Filing
21
ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 3/16/2015 is CONTINUED to Monday, 5/11/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. Updated Case Management Statement filed by 5/4/2015. Motions terminated: deny ing as moot 16 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Status Conference filed by Nationstar Mortgage, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., The Bank of New York Mellon. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/12/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2015)
|
March 4, 2015 |
Filing
15
ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 11 Motion to Dismiss as Moot. The hearing set for March 24, 2015 is VACATED. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2015)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?