SONG FI, INC. v. GOOGLE, INC. et al

Plaintiff: SONG FI, INC., JOSEPH N. BROTHERTON, LISA M. PELLEGRINO, N.G.B. and RASTA ROCK, INC.
Defendant: Google, Inc. and YouTube LLC
Case Number: 3:2014cv05080
Filed: November 18, 2014
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 7, 2018 256 Opinion or Order of the Court WRIT of Execution issued in the amount of $26,267.28 as to Song Fi, Inc, Rasta Rock Corporation, Joseph N. Brotherton. (original mailed to requesting party) (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2018)
May 15, 2018 237 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/15/18. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2018)
October 31, 2016 150 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 148 Administrative Motion for Extension of Time to File Expert Report. Plaintiff's Expert Damages Report due 11/7/2016. Defendant's Expert Damages Report due 12/7/2016. Plaintiffs Rebuttal due 12/21/2016. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2016)
September 16, 2016 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AWARDING ATTORNEYS' FEES. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/16/16. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2016)
August 8, 2016 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting in part and denying in part 114 Motion for Sanctions; granting 123 Motion for Leave to File Surreply. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2016)
June 27, 2016 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTION TO DISMISS THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Claudia Wilken granting in part and denying in part 107 Motion to Dismiss. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2016)
April 4, 2016 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 77 Motion to Dismiss. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2016)
April 1, 2016 96 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Settlement Conference set for 6/9/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 4/1/2016. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2016)
March 23, 2016 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken denying 88 Motion to Appoint Guardian Ad Litem ; denying 89 Motion to Appoint Guardian Ad Litem. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2016)
March 11, 2016 87 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Telephone Conference set for 3/29/2016 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 3/11/2016. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2016)
March 10, 2016 86 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/23/16. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2016)
October 29, 2015 67 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting 54 Motion for Leave to File. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2015)
July 24, 2015 56 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Briefing Schedule and Continuing Hearing as to 54 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint and Vacating Case Management Conference. Responses due by 8/14/2015. Replies due by 9/4/2015. Motion Hearing set for 9/11/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 07/24/2015. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2015)
June 10, 2015 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting 26 motion to dismiss and denying 32 partial motion for summary judgment. Leave to amend is granted in part. Plaintiffs shall file any amended complaint within thirty (30) days. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2015).
March 18, 2015 40 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Briefing Schedule as to 32 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Responses due by 3/23/2015. Replies due by 4/24/2015. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 03/18/2015. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2015)
February 12, 2015 36 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Rescheduling Hearing and Extending Briefing Schedule re Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. As to 32 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment: Responses due by 3/18/2015, and Replies due by 4/20/2015. Motion Hearings reset for 5/1/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 02/12/2015. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2015)
January 6, 2015 28 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RENOTICING HEARING AND EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE as to 26 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities. Responses due by 2/2/2015. Replies due by 3/4/2015. Motion Hearing set for 3/20/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 01/06/2015. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2015)
December 23, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Samuel Conti. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/23/14. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SONG FI, INC. v. GOOGLE, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SONG FI, INC.
Represented By: Ronald F. Wick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH N. BROTHERTON
Represented By: Ronald F. Wick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LISA M. PELLEGRINO
Represented By: Ronald F. Wick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N.G.B.
Represented By: Ronald F. Wick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RASTA ROCK, INC.
Represented By: Ronald F. Wick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Represented By: David H. Kramer
Represented By: Elizabeth Catherine Peterson
Represented By: Michael H. Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YouTube LLC
Represented By: David H. Kramer
Represented By: Elizabeth Catherine Peterson
Represented By: Michael H. Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?