Hung Tran v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Hung Tran
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., Quality Loan Service Corp., US Bank National Assn and JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2014cv05404
Filed: December 10, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 AMENDED 39 ORDER REMANDING ACTION TO ALAMEDA COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 4/20/2015. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2015)
April 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Remanding Action to Alameda County Superior Court.Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on April 16, 2015. (hsglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2015)
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING IN PART ( 17 , 18 ) MOTIONS TO DISMISS. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hung Tran v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hung Tran
Represented By: Glenn Lee Moss
Represented By: Ann Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Represented By: Bao M Vu
Represented By: Thomas Andrew Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bank National Assn
Represented By: Bao M Vu
Represented By: Thomas Andrew Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?