Wong v. Anderson et al
Plaintiff: Christine Wong
Defendant: Ellen Anderson, Linda Harrison, First American Title Company, Wells Fargo Bank, City and County of San Francisco and San Francisco Housing Development Corporation
Case Number: 3:2014cv05524
Filed: December 18, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 83 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 04/14/2015. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2015)
March 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 03/27/2015. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2015)
February 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 7 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting 11 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting 14 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting 16 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2015)
February 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 38 Motion for Summary Judgment (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2015)
February 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer regarding 26 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction NOTICE OF MOTION, MOTION AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF CITY� 39;S MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT, 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Responses due by 2/20/2015. Replies due by 2/27/2015. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wong v. Anderson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellen Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Title Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Francisco Housing Development Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?