Philliben et al v. Uber Technologies, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Matthew Philliben and Byron McKnight
Defendant: Uber Technologies, Inc. and Rasier, LLC
Miscellaneous: The People of the State of California
Case Number: 3:2014cv05615
Filed: December 23, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL AND GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES, COSTS, AND INCENTIVE AWARDS. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 13, 2019. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2019)
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF AMENDED CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 127 Motion for Settlement. Initial Date for Publishing Notice 9/7/2017. Deadline for Completing Notice Program 11/6/2017. Deadli ne for Plaintiffs' Counsel to File any Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Service Awards 12/7/2017. Deadline for Class Members to Submit Objections to the Proposed Settlement or Requests for Exclusion 1/8/2018. Deadline to Submit Pay ment Election Forms 1/8/2018. Deadline for Settlement Administrator to File List of Exclusions with the Court 1/18/2018. Deadline for Replies to Objections 1/25/2018. Deadline for Plaintiffs' Counsel to File Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement 1/25/2018. Fairness Hearing set for 2/8/2018 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2017) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/7/2017: # 1 Unredacted Version - Under Seal) (wsn, COURT STAFF).
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 124 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 123 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL DEADLINES BY ONE WEEK filed by Rasier, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 7/6/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 24, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2017)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 108 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 107 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference Schedule filed by Rasier, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 2/13/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/22/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 19, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2017)
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 106 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 105 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR DECEMBER 14, 2016 filed by Ernesto Mejia, Matthew Philliben, Todd Schreiber, Nate Coolidge, Julian Mena, Byron Mc Knight. Case Management Statement due by 1/13/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/25/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 7, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2016)
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 104 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 103 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR OCTOBER 19, 2016 filed by Ernesto Mejia, Matthew Philliben, Todd Schreiber, Nate Coolidge, Julian Mena, Byron McKnight. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/14/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 11, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2016)
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 9/7/2016. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 30, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2016)
March 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER RE: HEARING ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT re 75 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Julian Mena. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 8, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2016)
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER VACATING WITHOUT PREJUDICE MOTIONS TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING ARBITRATION re (25 in 3:14-cv-05615-JST) MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Arbitration filed by Rasier, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.; (31 in 3:15-cv-00064-JST) MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Arbitration filed by Uber Technologies, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 7, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2016)
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATION AND ORDER re (63 in 3:15-cv-00064-JST) JOINT STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES FOR ALL PURPOSES AND PERMITTING FILING OF CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT) filed by Julian Mena; (65 in 3:14-cv-05615-JST) JOINT STIPULA TION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES FOR ALL PURPOSES AND PERMITTING FILING OF CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT filed by Matthew Philliben, Byron McKnight. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 4, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2016)
December 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 64 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 63 JOINT STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER UPDATING THE COURT ON THE PARTIES' SETTLEMENT IN PRINCIPLE AND REQUESTING THAT ARBITRATION HEARING BE VACATED filed by Rasier, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 14, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2015)
December 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER SETTING COMBINED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 1/15/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/25/2016 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 10, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2015)
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 61 STIPULATION AND ORDER re (60 in 3:14-cv-05615-JST) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER UPDATING THE COURT ON SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS AND REQUESTING EXTENSION OF TEMPORARY STAY filed by Matthew Philliben, Byron McKnight, (58 in 3:15-cv-00064-JST). Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 16, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2015)
September 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION REQUESTING THIRD TEMPORARY STAY PENDING FURTHER MEDIATION re 57 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER UPDATING THE COURT ON SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS AND REQUESTING EXTENSION OF TEMPORARY STAY PENDING FURTHER MEDIATION filed by Matthew Philliben, Byron McKnight. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 17, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2015)
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER RE STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER re 50 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and Protective Order filed by Rasier, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 3, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2015)
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 48 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR TEMPORARY STAY PENDING MEDIATION filed by Rasier, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 29, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2015)
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER re 32 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Defendant's Motion to Stay Proceedings in Favor of Arbitration filed by Rasier, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 21, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2015)
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER re 30 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Extend Dates Pending Arbitration Motion filed by Rasier, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 6/10/2015. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/24/2015 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 25, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Philliben et al v. Uber Technologies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Philliben
Represented By: Mickel Montalban Arias
Represented By: Nicholas A. Coulson
Represented By: Steven Liddle
Represented By: Alfredo Torrijos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Byron McKnight
Represented By: Mickel Montalban Arias
Represented By: Nicholas A. Coulson
Represented By: Steven Liddle
Represented By: Alfredo Torrijos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uber Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rasier, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: The People of the State of California
Represented By: Ernst Andrew Halperin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?