March 7, 2017 |
Filing
247
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 246 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER to Modify Case Schedule filed by Jennifer Reilly, Justin Bartolet, Jonathan Grindell, Sandeep Pal, James Lathrop. Motion Hearing set for 9/14/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 7, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2017)
|
January 5, 2017 |
Filing
241
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 240 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Modify Case Schedule filed by Uber Technologies, Inc. Plaintiffs' expert designation 2/15/2017. Defendant's expert designation 3/17/2017. Plaintiffs' motion for class certification 4/27/2017. Defendant's opposition to class certification 6/2/2017. Plaintiffs' reply to motion for class certification 6/23/2017. Hearing on Plaintiffs' motion for class certification 7/20/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Mediation deadline 8/1/2017. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 5, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2017)
|
August 1, 2016 |
Filing
217
ORDER denying without prejudice 203 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Letter Brief No. 4 Regarding Discovery filed by Jennifer Reilly, Justin Bartolet, Jonathan Grindell, Sandeep Pal, James Lathrop.. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 08/01/16. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2016)
|
July 26, 2016 |
Filing
215
ORDER re 203 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Letter Brief No. 4 Regarding Discovery filed by Jennifer Reilly, Justin Bartolet, Jonathan Grindell, Sandeep Pal, James Lathrop. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 07/26/16. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2016)
|
July 15, 2016 |
Filing
210
SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiffs' expert disclosures 10/21/2016. Defendant's expert disclosures 11/21/2016. Plaintiffs' motion for class certification 1/17/2017. Defendant's opposition to class certification 2/21/2017. Plainti ffs' class certification reply 3/13/2017. Hearing on Plaintiffs' class certification motion 3/31/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. Mediation deadline 4/7/2017. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 15, 2016. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2016)
|
July 7, 2016 |
Filing
201
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO DEFER COURT'S CONSIDERATION OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 172 Motion TO DEFER COURT'S CONSIDERATION OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT UNTIL AFTER THE ORDER ON CLASS CERTIFICATION. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2016)
|
June 22, 2016 |
Filing
195
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 194 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 177 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint filed by Jennifer Reilly, Justin Bartolet, Jonathan Grindell, Sandeep Pal, James Lathrop. The plaintiff shall file the Third Amended Complaint within 3 days of this Order. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 22, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2016)
|
June 20, 2016 |
Filing
193
ORDER VACATING HEARING re 172 MOTION TO DEFER CONSIDERATION OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Jennifer Reilly, Justin Bartolet, Jonathan Grindell, Sandeep Pal, James Lathrop. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 17, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2016)
|
May 25, 2016 |
Filing
164
ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL: Re 162 Errata, filed by Jennifer Reilly, Justin Bartolet, Jonathan Grindell, Sandeep Pal, James Lathrop. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 5/25/2016. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2016)
|
May 6, 2016 |
Filing
156
ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANT'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL re 149 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Unopposed filed by Uber Technologies, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 6, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2016)
|
March 11, 2016 |
Filing
139
ORDER re 129 Joint Letter Brief Regarding Discovery. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 03/11/2016. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2016)
|
February 29, 2016 |
Filing
137
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 134 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 65 Case Management Conference - Further Extending Mediation Deadline filed by Uber Technologies, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 26, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2016)
|
February 18, 2016 |
Filing
132
ORDER REGARDING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part and denying in part 127 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 129 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2016)
|
February 3, 2016 |
Filing
126
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 124 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 122 Stipulation and Order, Stipulation to Extend the Page Limit for Parties' Joint Letter Brief filed by Jennifer Reilly, Justin Bartolet, Jonathan Grindell, Sandeep Pal, James Lathrop. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 3, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2016)
|
January 28, 2016 |
Filing
122
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 121 Stipulation to Amend Scheduling Order filed by Jennifer Reilly, Justin Bartolet, Jonathan Grindell, Sandeep Pal, James Lathrop, Julie McKinney. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 28, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2016)
|
January 13, 2016 |
Filing
116
ORDER RE: JOINT LETTER BRIEF ON DISCOVERY FILED DECEMBER 23, 2015. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 13, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2016)
|
January 8, 2016 |
Filing
112
ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying 71 Motion to Stay. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2016)
|
January 6, 2016 |
Filing
107
ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO WITHDRAW MOTION re 106 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion filed by Jennifer Reilly, Justin Bartolet, Jonathan Grindell, Sandeep Pal, James Lathrop, Julie McKinney; 73 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead C ounsel Motion for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel filed by Jennifer Reilly, Justin Bartolet, Jonathan Grindell, Sandeep Pal, James Lathrop, Julie McKinney. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 6, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2016)
|
December 22, 2015 |
Filing
94
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 92 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER ESI Protocol filed by Jennifer Reilly, Justin Bartolet, Jonathan Grindell, Sandeep Pal, James Lathrop, Julie McKinney. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 22, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2015)
|
November 2, 2015 |
Filing
66
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 63 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Amend Scheduling Order with Joint Declaration filed by Jennifer Reilly, Justin Bartolet, Jonathan Grindell, Sandeep Pal, James Lathrop, Julie McKinney. Plaintiffs&# 039; expert designation due 2/19/2016. Defendant's expert designation due 3/18/2016. Plaintiffs' Motion for class certification due 5/20/2016. Opposition due 6/20/2016. Replies due 7/5/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/21/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 2, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2015)
|
September 15, 2015 |
Filing
60
ORDER re 59 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Uber Technologies, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 15, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2015)
|
September 2, 2015 |
Filing
58
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 57 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Justin Bartolet, Jonathan Grindell, James Lathrop, Julie McKinney, Sandeep Pal, Jennifer Reilly. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 2, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2015)
|
July 27, 2015 |
Filing
53
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 52 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (PROTECTIVE) filed by Uber Technologies, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 27, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2015)
|
July 22, 2015 |
Filing
51
SCHEDULING ORDER. Deadline to add parties or amend pleadings: 8/10/2015. Plaintiff's expert designation: 11/13/2015. Defendant's expert designation: 12/18/2015. Motion for class certification due: 2/12/2016. Response due: 3/11/2016. Reply due: 3/25/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/25/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 22, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2015)
|
July 19, 2015 |
Filing
49
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS IN PART by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part 25 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2015)
|
June 2, 2015 |
Filing
44
ORDER REQUESTING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING RE MOTION TO DISMISS re 25 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Uber Technologies, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 2, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2015)
|
April 29, 2015 |
Filing
40
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 38 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Jennifer Reilly, Justin Bartolet, Jonathan Grindell, Sandeep Pal, James Lathrop, Kerry Reardon, Julie McKinney. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/20/2015 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 29, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2015)
|
April 7, 2015 |
Filing
36
ORDER VACATING HEARING re 25 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Uber Technologies, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 7, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2015)
|
March 17, 2015 |
Filing
32
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 30 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Uber Technologies, Inc. and Plaintiffs filed by Uber Technologies, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 17, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2015)
|
March 3, 2015 |
Filing
26
ORDER NOTING CONTINUANCE OF DEFENDANT'S RESPONSIVE PLEADING DEADLINE AS TO PLAINTIFFS MCKINNEY AND PAL re 23 Ex Parte Application for Leave to Clarify and/or Continue Defendant's Responsive Pleading as to Plaintiffs Julie McKinn ey and Sandeep Pal filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.; 24 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed by Jennifer Reilly, Justin Bartolet, Jonathan Grindell, Sandeep Pal, James Lathrop, Kerry Reardon, Julie McKinney. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 3, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2015)
|
February 3, 2015 |
Filing
13
ORDER GRANTING re 11 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Amended Complaint filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/3/15. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2015)
|