E & E Co., Ltd. v. Light In The Box Limited
Plaintiff: E & E Co., Ltd.
Defendant: Light In The Box Limited
Case Number: 3:2015cv00069
Filed: January 7, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 99 AMENDED ORDER re 95 STIPULATED INJUNCTION filed by E & E Co., Ltd.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/20/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2016)
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER re 94 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by E & E Co., Ltd. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/20/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2016)
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 87 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 86 CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE and ADR PHONE CONFERENCE filed by Light In The Box Limited. Case Management Statement due by 3/31/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/7/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/7/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2016)
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 85 STIPULATION AND ORDER re: 84 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, ASSOCIATED DATES, AND ADR PHONE CONFERENCE filed by Light In The Box Limited. Case Management Statement due by 3/10/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/17/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/19/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2016)
January 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 76 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 75 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 72 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO FILE REPLY filed by Light In The Box Limited. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/19/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2016)
December 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 71 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 70 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 60 Amended Complaint STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Light In The Box Limited. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/18/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2015)
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 69 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 68 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 60 Amended Complaint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Time to Respond to Second Amended Complaint filed by Light In The Box Limited. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/2/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2015)
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 67 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 66 CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Light In The Box Limited Case Management Statement due by 1/14/2016. Case Management Conference reset for 1/21/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/16/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2015)
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER re 56 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by E & E Co., Ltd. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/19/15. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2015)
October 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 34 Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2015)
August 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 28 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT LIGHT IN THE BOX LIMITED'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT. Responses due by 8/26/2015. Replies due by 9/2/2015. Hearing set for 9/24/15 at 1:30 p.m.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/19/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2015)
April 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Appointing International Process Server. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/30/2015. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: E & E Co., Ltd. v. Light In The Box Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E & E Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Stephen Douglas Collins
Represented By: Kevin Walter Isaacson
Represented By: Curtis R. Tingley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Light In The Box Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?