Oman v. Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Plaintiff: Oman, Dev Anand Oman, Todd Eichmann, Michael Lehr and Albert Flores
Defendant: Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv00131
Filed: January 9, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER GRANTING #121 MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION; REQUIRING FILING OF THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT; AND DENYING #122 MOTION FOR LEAVE by Judge William H. Orrick. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2023)
September 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 127 REPLY (re #122 MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Answer and a Further Motion for Partial Summary Judgment ) filed byDelta Air Lines, Inc.. (Frederick, Andrew) (Filed on 9/1/2023)
September 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 126 REPLY (re #121 MOTION to Certify Class ) filed byTodd Eichmann, Albert Flores, Michael Lehr, Dev Anand Oman. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Matthew C. Helland, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4)(Helland, Matthew) (Filed on 9/1/2023)
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ERRATA re #121 MOTION to Certify Class by Todd Eichmann, Albert Flores, Michael Lehr, Dev Anand Oman. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexander Wise)(Helland, Matthew) (Filed on 8/29/2023)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 124 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #121 MOTION to Certify Class ) filed byDelta Air Lines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew P. Frederick in Support of Delta's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification)(Frederick, Andrew) (Filed on 8/25/2023)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 123 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #122 MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Answer and a Further Motion for Partial Summary Judgment ) filed byTodd Eichmann, Albert Flores, Michael Lehr, Dev Anand Oman. (Helland, Matthew) (Filed on 8/25/2023)
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 122 MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Answer and a Further Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew P. Frederick in Support of Delta's Motion for Leave to File an Amended Answer and a Further Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #2 Proposed Order)(Frederick, Andrew) (Filed on 8/11/2023)
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 121 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Todd Eichmann, Albert Flores, Michael Lehr, Dev Anand Oman. Motion Hearing set for 9/27/2023 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 8/18/2023. Replies due by 8/25/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Matthew C. Helland, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Declaration Todd Eichmann, #5 Declaration Albert Flores, #6 Proposed Order)(Helland, Matthew) (Filed on 8/4/2023)
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 120 STIPULATION Regarding Wage Statement Format filed by Todd Eichmann, Albert Flores, Michael Lehr, Dev Anand Oman, Delta Air Lines, Inc. (Helland, Matthew) (Filed on 8/4/2023) Modified on 8/4/2023 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 119 CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING ZOOM HEARING - Case Management Conference reset for 10/17/2023 02:00 PM (Case Management Statement due by 10/10/2023). This proceeding will be held via Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/who General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2023)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 118 CLERKS NOTICE RE ZOOM HEARING - The Case Management Conference set for 05/16/2023 at 2:00 p.m. will be held via Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/who General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2023)
May 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 117 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Todd Eichmann, Albert Flores, Michael Lehr, Dev Anand Oman, Delta Air Lines, Inc. (Helland, Matthew) (Filed on 5/9/2023) Modified on 5/10/2023 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 116 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Orrick: Case Management Conference held on 10/4/2022. Case Management Statement due by 5/9/2023. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/16/2023 02:00 PM via Videoconference. Motion Hearing re Class Certification set for 9/27/2023 02:00 PM via Videoconference. Digital Recording Time: 1:55-1:57. Plaintiff Attorney: Matthew C. Helland. Defendant Attorney: Andrew P. Frederick. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/4/2022)
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 115 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Todd Eichmann, Albert Flores, Michael Lehr, Dev Anand Oman, Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (Helland, Matthew) (Filed on 9/27/2022) Modified on 9/27/2022 (kkp, COURT STAFF).
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 114 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 9/27/2022 to address case schedule. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/4/2022 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/who p>General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Case Management Statement due by 9/27/2022. Further Case Management Con ference set for 10/4/2022 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wholc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2022)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #99 , #100 CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge William H. Orrick. (jmd, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/8/2022 to add document image (jmd, COURT STAFF).
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 112 Supplemental Brief regarding the Parties' Cross-Motions for Partial Summary Judgment re #110 Order filed by Todd Eichmann, Albert Flores, Michael Lehr, Dev Anand Oman. (Related document(s) #110 ) (Brome, Daniel) (Filed on 5/18/2022) Modified on 5/19/2022 (kkp, COURT STAFF).
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 111 Supplemental Brief regarding the Parties' Cross-Motions for Partial Summary Judgment re #110 Order filed by Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (Related document(s) #110 ) (Frederick, Andrew) (Filed on 5/18/2022) Modified on 5/19/2022 (kkp, COURT STAFF).
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/12/2022. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2022)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 109 RESPONSE re #108 Statementof Recent Decision by Delta Air Lines, Inc. (Horn, Taylor) (Filed on 5/10/2022) Modified on 5/11/2022 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 108 Statement of Recent Decision by Todd Eichmann, Albert Flores, Michael Lehr, Dev Anand Oman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Brome, Daniel) (Filed on 5/10/2022)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 107 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Orrick: Motion Hearing held on 5/4/2022 re #100 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and #99 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Total Time in Court: 22 minutes. Court Reporter: Ruth Levine Ekhaus. Plaintiff Attorney: Matthew C. Helland and Daniel S. Brome. Defendant Attorney: Andrew P. Frederick and Brendan T. Killeen. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/4/2022)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 106 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HARING - The Motion Hearing set for 5/4/2022 02:00 PM will be held via Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/who General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcas ting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/ A>. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2022)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 105 REPLY (re #100 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) filed byDelta Air Lines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Andrew P. Frederick in Support of Defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment)(Frederick, Andrew) (Filed on 4/15/2022)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 104 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #100 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) and Reply Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed byTodd Eichmann, Albert Flores, Michael Lehr, Dev Anand Oman. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Todd Eichmann and Ex. A, #2 Declaration of Albert Flores and Ex. A)(Helland, Matthew) (Filed on 4/1/2022)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 103 Declaration of Andrew P. Frederick in Support of #100 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byDelta Air Lines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B-E, #2 Exhibit F-P)(Related document(s) #100 ) (Frederick, Andrew) (Filed on 3/18/2022)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 102 Declaration of Sharon Toles in Support of #100 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byDelta Air Lines, Inc.. (Related document(s) #100 ) (Frederick, Andrew) (Filed on 3/18/2022)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 101 Declaration of Timithia Cofer in Support of #100 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byDelta Air Lines, Inc.. (Related document(s) #100 ) (Frederick, Andrew) (Filed on 3/18/2022)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 100 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Delta Air Lines, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/4/2022 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 4/1/2022. Replies due by 4/8/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Delta Air Lines, Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Denying Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment)(Frederick, Andrew) (Filed on 3/18/2022)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Todd Eichmann, Albert Flores, Michael Lehr, Dev Anand Oman. Motion Hearing set for 5/4/2022 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 3/11/2022. Replies due by 3/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew C. Helland, #2 Exhibit 1- Monthly Flight Activity Report for Plaintiff Michael Lehr, #3 Exhibit 2- Monthly Flight Activity Report for Plaintiff Todd Eichmann, #4 Exhibit 3- Monthly Flight Activity report for Plaintiff Albert Flores, #5 Exhibit 4- Flight Attendant Work Rules, #6 Exhibit 5- John Early Deposition Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 6- Wage Statements to Plaintiff Michael Lehr, #8 Exhibit 7- Wage Statements to Plaintiff Todd Eichmann, #9 Exhibit 8- Wage Statements to Plaintiff Albert Flores, #10 Exhibit 9- Shelby Cox Deposition Exhibit 5, #11 Exhibit 10- Shelby Cox Deposition Exhibit 7, #12 Exhibit 11- Shelby Cox Deposition Exhibit 8, #13 Exhibit 12- Shelby Cox Deposition Exhibit 9, #14 Exhibit 13- Shelby Cox Deposition Exhibit 10, #15 Exhibit 14- Shelby Cox Deposition Exhibit 11, #16 Exhibit 15- Shelby Cox Deposition Exhibit 1, #17 Exhibit 16- Shelby Cox Deposition Exhibit 4, #18 Exhibit 17- Shelby Cox Deposition Exhibit 6, #19 Exhibit 18- Senate Rules Floor Analysis of SB 1255, #20 Exhibit 19- Cited Portions of the Deposition of Shelby Cox, #21 Exhibit 20- Cited portions of the Deposition of Kathleen Dixon, #22 Declaration of Albert Flores, #23 Declaration of Todd Eichmann, #24 Declaration of Valentin Estevez, #25 Declaration of Alexander Wise, #26 Proposed Order)(Helland, Matthew) (Filed on 2/25/2022)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER of US Supreme Court. The petition for a writ of certiorari is denied. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2022)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 97 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #96 Stipulation. Close of Fact Discovery: 2/4/2022. Motion Hearing set for 5/4/2022 02:00 PM before Judge William H. Orrick. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2021)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 96 Third Stipulation and (Proposed) Order Extending Discovery and Briefing Schedule and Continuing Hearing on Cross Motions for Summary Judgment filed by Todd Eichmann, Albert Flores, Michael Lehr, Dev Anand Oman, Delta Air Lines, Inc. (Helland, Matthew) (Filed on 11/30/2021) Modified on 12/1/2021 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER EXTENDING DISCOVERY AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND CONTINUING HEARING ON CROSS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge William H. Orrick granting #94 Stipulation. Discovery cutoff: 12/17/2021. Dispositive Motions to be heard by 3/23/2022. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2021)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 94 SECOND STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER EXTENDING DISCOVERY AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND CONTINUING HEARING ON CROSS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Delta Air Lines, Inc., Todd Eichmann, Albert Flores, Michael Lehr, Dev Anand Oman. (Frederick, Andrew) (Filed on 11/9/2021) Modified on 11/9/2021 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER EXTENDING DISCOVERY AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND CONTINUING HEARING ON CROSS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge William H. Orrick granting #92 Stipulation. Motion Hearing reset for 2/23/2022 02:00 PM via Videoconference before Judge William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2021)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 92 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING DISCOVERY AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND CONTINUING HEARING ON CROSS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Delta Air Lines, Inc., Todd Eichmann, Albert Flores, Michael Lehr, Dav Anand Oman. (Frederick, Andrew) (Filed on 10/19/2021) Modified on 10/19/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 91 USCA Case Number 21-396 U.S. Supreme Court. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2021)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Orrick: Case Management Conference held on 7/20/2021. Motion Hearing set for 1/19/2022 02:00 PM via Videoconference before Judge William H. Orrick.Total Time in Court: 5 minutes. Court Reporter: Ana Dub. Plaintiff Attorney: Matthew C. Helland. Defendant Attorney: Andrew P. Frederick and Brendan T. Killeen. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/20/2021)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 89 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING - The Case Management Conference set for 7/20/2021 02:00 PM will be held via Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/who General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscour ts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2021)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 88 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #87 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Brendan T. Kllleen. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2021)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16183012.) filed by Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (Killeen, Brendan) (Filed on 7/15/2021)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 86 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (JOINT) filed by Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (Frederick, Andrew) (Filed on 7/15/2021)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 85 CLERK'S NOTICE - Case Management Conference set for 7/20/2021 02:00 PM via Videoconference. Case Statement due by 7/15/2021. (This is a text-only entry genera ted by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2021)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 84 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Request for Case Management Conference filed by Todd Eichmann, Albert Flores, Michael Lehr, Dev Anand Oman. (Helland, Matthew) (Filed on 7/7/2021)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MANDATE of USCA as to #70 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit, filed by Dev Anand Oman, Albert Flores, Michael Lehr, Todd Eichmann. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2021)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER of USCA as to #70 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit, filed by Dev Anand Oman, Albert Flores, Michael Lehr, Todd Eichmann. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2021)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 81 USCA Memorandum as to #70 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit, filed by Dev Anand Oman, Albert Flores, Michael Lehr, Todd Eichmann. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2021)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER of USCA as to #70 Notice of Appeal, filed by Dev Anand Oman, Albert Flores, Michael Lehr, Todd Eichmann. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2020)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER of USCA We respectfully ask the Supreme Court of California to exercise its discretion to decide the certified questions set forth in section II of this order; as to #70 Notice of Appeal, filed by Dev Anand Oman, Albert Flores, Michael Lehr, Todd Eichmann (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2018)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Costs Taxed in the amount of $ 6868.22 against Dev Anand Oman. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2017)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 01/04/2017 before Hon. William H. Orrick by Todd Eichmann, Albert Flores, Michael Lehr, Dev Anand Oman, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Brome, Daniel) (Filed on 2/14/2017)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/16/2015 before Hon. William H. Orrick by Todd Eichmann, Albert Flores, Michael Lehr, Dev Anand Oman, for Court Reporter Joan Columbini. (Brome, Daniel) (Filed on 2/14/2017)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Transcript Designation Form for proceedings held on 12/16/2015; 01/26/2016; 01/04/2017 before Judge William H. Orrick, (Brome, Daniel) (Filed on 2/14/2017)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 NOTICE of Change of Address by Matthew C Helland (Helland, Matthew) (Filed on 2/7/2017)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 USCA Case Number 17-15124 for #70 Notice of Appeal, filed by Dev Anand Oman, Albert Flores, Michael Lehr, Todd Eichmann. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2017)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 BILL OF COSTS by Delta Air Lines, Inc.. Objections due by 2/1/2017 (Frederick, Andrew) (Filed on 1/18/2017)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Transcript of Proceedings held on January 4, 2017, before Judge William H. Orrick. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, CRR, RDR, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov, telephone number (415)373-2529. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #66 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/18/2017. (Related documents(s) #66 ) (Ball, Belle) (Filed on 1/18/2017)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Todd Eichmann, Albert Flores, Michael Lehr, Dev Anand Oman. Appeal of Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,,, #45 , Judgment #69 , Order Dismissing Case, #68 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-11081520 paid.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Helland, Matthew) (Filed on 1/18/2017) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/27/2017: #4 USCA NUMBER 17-15124) (aaa, COURT STAFF).
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/06/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2017)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Defendant's motion for partial summary judgment is GRANTED and plaintiffs' motion is DENIED. Because no issues remain in this case, judgment will be entered in Delta's favor in full. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/06/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2017)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byTodd Eichmann, Albert Flores, Michael Lehr, Dev Anand Oman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Helland, Matthew) (Filed on 1/5/2017)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 01/04/2017 before Hon. William H. Orrick by Delta Air Lines, Inc., for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Frederick, Andrew) (Filed on 1/5/2017)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. William H. Orrick: Motion Hearing held on 1/4/2017 re #58 MOTION for Summary Judgment and #59 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Motions taken under submission; written order to follow. Total Time in Court 29 minutes. Court Reporter Name Belle Ball. Plaintiff Attorney Matthew C. Helland and Daniel Brown. Defendant Attorney R.J. Hendricks and Andrew Frederick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/4/2017)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CHANGE IN COURTROOM - The motion hearing set for 2:00 p.m. today (1/4/2017) will be conducted in Courtroom 12 on the 19th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2017)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 REPLY (re #59 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) Reply Memorandum of Defendant In Further Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment filed byDelta Air Lines, Inc.. (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 12/21/2016)
December 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Transcript of Proceedings held on December 16, 2015, before Judge William H. Orrick. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, RPR, CSR, telephone number joan.columbini.csr@gmail.com, 510-367-3043. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #61 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 1/3/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/12/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/13/2017. (Related documents(s) #61 ) (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 12/12/2016)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/16/2015 before Hon. William H. Orrick by Delta Air Lines, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Frederick, Andrew) (Filed on 12/9/2016)
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #59 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) Plaintiffs' Response Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and Reply Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment filed byTodd Eichmann, Albert Flores, Michael Lehr, Dev Anand Oman. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew C. Helland, #2 Exhibit 17, #3 Exhibit 18, #4 Exhibit 19, #5 Exhibit 20, #6 Exhibit 21, #7 Exhibit 22, #8 Exhibit 23, #9 Exhibit 24)(Helland, Matthew) (Filed on 12/7/2016)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Delta Air Lines, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/4/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 12/6/2016. Replies due by 12/13/2016. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Frederick, #2 Declaration of Moreau, #3 Declaration of Estevez, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 11/22/2016)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Reset Deadline as to #59 MOTION for Summary Judgment (to correct the calendar year of the hearing date). Motion Hearing set for 1/4/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2016)
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Todd Eichmann, Albert Flores, Michael Lehr, Dev Anand Oman. Motion Hearing set for 1/4/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 11/22/2016. Replies due by 12/7/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Matthew C. Helland, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Declaration of Albert Flores, #20 Declaration of Michael Lehr, #21 Declaration of Todd Eichmann)(Helland, Matthew) (Filed on 11/8/2016)
August 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER REGARDING CROSS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #56 Stipulation. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2016)
August 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER regarding Cross Motions for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Wage Statement Claims filed by Todd Eichmann, Albert Flores, Michael Lehr, Dev Anand Oman. (Brome, Daniel) (Filed on 8/26/2016)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Transcript of Proceedings held on January 26, 2016, before Judge William H. Orrick. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, CSR, telephone number joan.columbini.csr@gmail.com 510-367-3043. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #54 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 9/7/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/19/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/15/2016. (Related documents(s) #54 ) (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 8/17/2016)
June 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on January 26, 2016 before Hon. William H. Orrick by Delta Air Lines, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Frederick, Andrew) (Filed on 6/28/2016)
March 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ANSWER to #53 Second Amended Complaint ; byDelta Air Lines, Inc.. (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 3/10/2016) Modified on 3/11/2016 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
February 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Class Action Complaint for Damages, Restitution, and Injunctive Relief against Delta Air Lines, Inc.. Filed byDev Anand Oman, Michael Lehr, Todd Eichmann. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Helland, Matthew) (Filed on 2/10/2016)
February 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #50 Stipulation to File a Second Amended Complaint. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2016)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Allowing Plaintiffs To File A Second Amended Complaint filed by Todd Eichmann, Michael Lehr, Dev Anand Oman. (Helland, Matthew) (Filed on 2/8/2016)
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. William H. Orrick: Further Case Management Conference held on 1/26/2016. Motion Hearing set for 11/9/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. FTR Time 2:15-2:24. Plaintiff Attorneys Matt Helland and Daniel Brome. Defendant Attorney Robert J. Hendricks. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/26/2016)
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CHANGE IN COURTROOM - Case Management Conference set for 1/26/2016 02:00 PM will be conducted in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2016)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MOTION for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration filed by Todd Eichmann, Michael Lehr, Dev Anand Oman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Helland, Matthew) (Filed on 1/20/2016)
January 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (Frederick, Andrew) (Filed on 1/19/2016)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER ON CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge William H. Orrick re #32 Motion for Summary Judgment and #36 Motion for Summary Judgment. Delta's motion for summary judgment on plaintiffs' First, Second, and Third claims is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' cross-motion for summary judgment is DENIED. The parties shall file a Joint Case Management Conference Statement by January 19, 2016 that describes the remaining issues in this case and proposes a schedule to adjudicate them. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2015)
December 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. William H. Orrick: Motion Hearing held on 12/16/2015 re #32 , #36 Motions for Summary Judgment. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/26/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Case Management Statement due by 1/19/2016.)FTR Time 2:35-3:03. Plaintiff Attorneys Matthew Helland and Daniel Brome. Defendant Attorneys Robert Jon Hendricks and Andrew Paul Frederick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/16/2015) Modified on 12/9/2016: Matter transcribed by Joan Columbini. (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
December 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (Frederick, Andrew) (Filed on 12/9/2015)
November 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING PROCEEDINGS - The Case Management Conference and Hearings re #32 , #36 Motions for Summary Judgment are CONTINUED to 12/16/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
November 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #40 STIPULATION REGARDING A CONTINUANCE OF THE HEARING ON THE PARTIES' #32 , #36 CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Motion Hearing continued to 11/25/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/10/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2015)
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING A CONTINUANCE OF THE HEARING ON THE PARTIES CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (Frederick, Andrew) (Filed on 11/9/2015)
November 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 REPLY (re #36 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment ) filed byTodd Eichmann, Michael Lehr, Dev Anand Oman. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew C. Helland, #2 Exhibits 20 to 26, #3 Exhibits 27 to 28, #4 Exhibit 29 (part one), #5 Exhibit 29 (part two) to 32)(Helland, Matthew) (Filed on 11/4/2015)
October 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 REPLY (re #32 MOTION for Summary Judgment Delta Air Lines, Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment ) filed byDelta Air Lines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Watson ISO Delta's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #2 Declaration (Supplement) of Andrew P. Frederick ISO Delta's Partial Summary Judgment)(Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 10/28/2015)
October 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 EXHIBITS re #36 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Exhibits 10-19 filed byTodd Eichmann, Michael Lehr, Dev Anand Oman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 10 Part One, #2 Exhibit 10 Part Two, #3 Exhibit 10 Part Three, #4 Exhibits 11-15, #5 Exhibits 16-19)(Related document(s) #36 ) (Helland, Matthew) (Filed on 10/14/2015)
October 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Todd Eichmann, Michael Lehr, Dev Anand Oman. Motion Hearing set for 11/18/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 10/28/2015. Replies due by 11/4/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Matthew C. Helland, #3 Exhibits 1-2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibits 4-5, #6 Exhibits 6-7, #7 Exhibits 8-9)(Helland, Matthew) (Filed on 10/14/2015)
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 EXHIBITS re #33 Declaration in Support, Exhibits I-O filed byDelta Air Lines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit J, #2 Exhibit K, #3 Exhibit L, #4 Exhibit M, #5 Exhibit N, #6 Exhibit O)(Related document(s) #33 ) (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 9/29/2015)
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 EXHIBITS re #33 Declaration in Support, Exhibits A-H filed byDelta Air Lines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit F, #6 Exhibit G, #7 Exhibit H)(Related document(s) #33 ) (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 9/29/2015)
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Declaration of Andrew Frederick in Support of #32 MOTION for Summary Judgment Delta Air Lines, Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed byDelta Air Lines, Inc.. (Related document(s) #32 ) (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 9/29/2015)
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION for Summary Judgment Delta Air Lines, Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Delta Air Lines, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/18/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 10/13/2015. Replies due by 10/20/2015. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian Moreau, #2 Proposed Order)(Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 9/29/2015)
September 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER REGARDING LENGTH OF BRIEFS FOR PARTIES' CROSSMOTIONS FOR SUMMARYJUDGMENT by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #30 Stipulation. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2015)
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and Proposed Order Re: Length of Briefs for Parties' Cross Motions for Summary Judgment filed by Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (Frederick, Andrew) (Filed on 9/24/2015)
September 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER RE DISCOVERY DISPUTE by Hon. William H. Orrick as to #28 Discovery Letter Brief. Delta is required to produce the NWA work rules to the plaintiffs. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2015)
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Todd Eichmann, Michael Lehr, Dev Anand Oman. (Helland, Matthew) (Filed on 9/8/2015)
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Delta Air Lines, Inc.'s ANSWER to #24 Amended Complaint byDelta Air Lines, Inc.. (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 6/12/2015) Modified on 6/15/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Stipulated Protective Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #25 Stipulation. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2015)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Protective Order filed by Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (Frederick, Andrew) (Filed on 6/1/2015)
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT for Damages, Restitution, and Injunctive Relief - CORRECTION OF DOCKET #23 against Delta Air Lines, Inc. Filed by Dev Anand Oman, Todd Eichmann, Michael Lehr. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A)(Helland, Matthew) (Filed on 5/26/2015) Modified on 5/28/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
May 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SEE DOCKET NUMBER #24 FOR CORRECT E-FILING FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT for Damages, Restitution, and Injunctive Relief against Delta Air Lines, Inc.. Filed by Dev Anand Oman. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A)(Helland, Matthew) (Filed on 5/22/2015) Modified on 5/28/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
May 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #21 Stipulation. Plaintiff may file a First Amended Complaint. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2015)
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Allowing Plaintiff to File a First Amended Complaint filed by Dev Anand Oman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Brome, Daniel) (Filed on 5/19/2015)
April 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. William H. Orrick: Initial Case Management Conference held on 4/7/2015. Deadline to amend/add parties: 5/29/2015. Cross motions to be heard 11/18/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/15/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco (Case Management Statement due by 12/8/2015). Court Reporter: 2:01-2:05. Plaintiff Attorneys Matthew Helland and Daniel Brome. Defendant Attorneys R.J. Hendricks and Andrew Frederick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/7/2015)
March 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 3/31/2015)
March 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 3/26/2015)
March 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Certificate of Interested Entities by Delta Air Lines, Inc. (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 3/5/2015)
March 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement by Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 3/5/2015)
March 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint byDelta Air Lines, Inc.. (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 3/5/2015) Modified on 3/6/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
February 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Brome, Daniel) (Filed on 2/4/2015)
January 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANT DELTA AIR LINES, INC. TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT filed by Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 1/29/2015)
January 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dev Anand Oman re #10 Case Management Scheduling Order, on Defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc. (Brome, Daniel) (Filed on 1/21/2015)
January 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dev Anand Oman. Delta Air Lines, Inc. served on 1/13/2015, answer due 2/3/2015. (Brome, Daniel) (Filed on 1/21/2015)
January 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 3/31/2015. Case Management Conference set for 4/7/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/14/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2015)
January 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Delta Air Lines, Inc. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2015)
January 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/2/2015. Case Management Conference set for 4/9/2015 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/9/15. (Attachments: #1 MEJ Standing Order, #2 Standing Order)(aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2015)
January 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/12/15. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2015)
January 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2015)
January 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Dev Anand Oman.. (Helland, Matthew) (Filed on 1/9/2015)
January 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2015)
January 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Dev Anand Oman (Brome, Daniel) (Filed on 1/9/2015)
January 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Brome, Daniel) (Filed on 1/9/2015)
January 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES, RESTITUTION, AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF (1) Failure to Pay Minimum Wage in Violation of California Law (Cal.Lab.Code 1182.12, 1194, and 1194.2, and IWC Wage Order(s)); (2) Failure to Pay Minimum Wage in Violation of San Francisco Minimum Wage Ordinance (San Francisco Admin.Code 12R); (3) Failure to Pay Minimum Wage in Violation of San Jose Minimum Wage Ordinance (San Jose Mun.Code 4.100); (4) Waiting Time Penalties (Cal.Lab.Code 201-203); (5) Wage Statement Penalties (Cal.Lab.Code 226); (6) Violation of California Business and Professions Code 17200 et seq; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; against Delta Air Lines, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-9197971.). Filed byDev Anand Oman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Helland, Matthew) (Filed on 1/9/2015) Modified on 1/12/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oman v. Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dev Anand Oman
Represented By: Matthew C. Helland
Represented By: Daniel S. Brome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Eichmann
Represented By: Daniel S. Brome
Represented By: Matthew C. Helland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Lehr
Represented By: Daniel S. Brome
Represented By: Matthew C. Helland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Flores
Represented By: Daniel S. Brome
Represented By: Matthew C. Helland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Jon Hendricks
Represented By: Andrew Paul Frederick
Represented By: Brendan T Killeen
Represented By: Taylor D. Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?