Sampson et al v. Ukiah Valley Medical Center et al
Plaintiff: Alan Sampson and Kathy Sampson
Defendant: Ukiah Valley Medical Center, Adventist Health, Debbie L Marks, Pacific Redwood Medical Group, Calstar and Department of California Highway Patrol
Case Number: 3:2015cv00160
Filed: January 12, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 250 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 249 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Kathy Sampson, Alan Sampson. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 2, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2018)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER ON UKIAH VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER'S 119 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER granting 111 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE THE TIME TO FILE A MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND FOR HEARING ON THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Adventist Health. Motion to be heard by 5/12/2017. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/12/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2017)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER by Judge William H. Orrick granting 92 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 95 Motion for Summary Judgment. (COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2017)
August 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 80 CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/23/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2016)
December 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER DENYING MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE re: 55 MOTION to Dismiss and 53 MOTION to Dismiss. Deadline to Amend/add parties: 4/15/2016. Discovery due by 10/3/2016. Case Management Conference set for 4/19/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco (Case Management Statement due by 4/12/2016). Dispositive motions to be heard by 3/8/2017. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/8/2017 02:00 PM and Jury Trial set for 6/5/2017 08:30 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/22/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2015)
April 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting 8 MOTION to Continue. Case Management Conference continued to 6/9/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 6/2/2015. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/07/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sampson et al v. Ukiah Valley Medical Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Sampson
Represented By: David J. Millstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Sampson
Represented By: David J. Millstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ukiah Valley Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adventist Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debbie L Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Redwood Medical Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calstar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of California Highway Patrol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?