Center For Biological Diversity v. U.S. Department of Interior et al
Plaintiff: Center For Biological Diversity
Defendant: U.S. Department of Interior, Sally Jewell, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service and Dan Ashe
Case Number: 3:2015cv00658
Filed: February 12, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1365
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER GRANTING re 70 Status Report and Stipulation for Extension of Stay filed by U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, Sally Jewell, Dan Ashe, U.S. Department of Interior. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/10/16. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2016)
February 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER GRANTING re 70 Status Report and Stipulation for Extension of Stay filed by U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, Sally Jewell, Dan Ashe, U.S. Department of Interior. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/10/16. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2016)
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER GRANTING re 68 Status Report and Stipulation for Extension of Stay (18 days) filed by U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, Sally Jewell, Dan Ashe, U.S. Department of Interior. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/22/16. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2016)
August 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero denying 29 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Parties shall meet and confer and submit a proposed schedule for the next phase of the case by September 7, 2015. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2015)
June 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 21 Motion of Croplife America to Intervene as Defendant (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2015)
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING re 27 Letter filed by Proposed Intervenor CropLife America for Kirsten Nathanson to listen to 5/15 proceedings by phone. Counsel shall be on phone standby and await the Court's call. Signed, as modified, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/13/15. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2015)
April 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting re 18 Letter filed by U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, Sally Jewell, Dan Ashe, U.S. Department of Interior for Brett Grosko to appear by phone on 5/15/15 at 2:00 PM.. Signed, as modified, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/24/15. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2015)
April 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER on 13 stipulation to extend time to answer or respond to complaint. Response due May 7, 2015. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on April 20, 2015. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Center For Biological Diversity v. U.S. Department of Interior et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center For Biological Diversity
Represented By: Collette Lucille Adkins Giese
Represented By: Justin Augustine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Interior
Represented By: John Brett Grosko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sally Jewell
Represented By: John Brett Grosko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service
Represented By: John Brett Grosko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Ashe
Represented By: John Brett Grosko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?