Ardds v. Pizano et al
Plaintiff: Antoine L. Ardds
Defendant: M. Pizano, E. Lopez and S. Hampton
Case Number: 3:2015cv00686
Filed: February 13, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: PSLC MWD
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER OF SERVICE;ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO FILE A DISPOSITIVE MOTION OR NOTICE REGARDING SUCH MOTION;INSTRUCTIONS TO CLERK. Dispositive Motion due by 8/7/2017.. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/28/17. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2017)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Chief Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/26/16. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2016)
January 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DISMISSING 12 First Amended Complaint with Leave to Amend. Second Amended Complaint due by 2/22/2016. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/13/16. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2016)
June 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed 6/22/15, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. denying 7 Motion to Amend/Correct. Amended Complaint due by 7/24/2015. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ardds v. Pizano et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antoine L. Ardds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Pizano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?