Loop AI Labs, Inc. v. Gatti et al
Plaintiff: Loop AI Labs Inc
Defendant: Anna Gatti, Almaviva S.p.A, Almawave S.r.l., Almawave USA Inc., IQSystem LLC and IQSystem, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv00798
Filed: February 20, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1029 ORDER DENYING 1027 REQUEST FOR CLARIFICATION. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 2/25/2020. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2020)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1020 AMENDED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 840 Defendants' Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 4/24/2017.CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 977 . Order amended to address error in footnote numbering. No substantive changes made. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2017)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1013 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING ( 996 , 1003 ) MOTIONS FOR FEES AND COSTS(terminating docket nos. 1004 , 1008 ). (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2017)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1010 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. CONTINUING THE DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO ALMAWAVE DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS (terminating docket no. 1000 ). (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2017)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 995 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 3/21/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2017)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 993 ORDER IMPOSING TERMINATING SANCTIONS. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 3/9/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2017)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 991 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying 978 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2017)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 989 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying without prejudice 519 Discovery Letter Brief; 584 Discovery Letter Brief; 607 Discovery Letter Brief; 679 Discovery Letter Brief; 691 Discovery Letter Brief; 715 Discovery Letter Brief; 769 Discovery Letter Brief. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2017)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 987 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. STRIKING 986 MOTION FOR PARTIAL JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2017)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 977 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 840 Defendants' Motion for Sanctions. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2017)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 973 ORDER Awarding Sanctions to Almawave USA Inc. re 895 Discovery Letter Brief for Expenses Related to Witness Luca Ferri, 970 , 971 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 1/23/2017. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2017)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 969 Second Supplemental Order re Almawave USA, Inc.'s Motion to Quash and/or for Protective Order 168 , 901 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 1/11/2017. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2017)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 967 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Denying 966 Administrative Motion for Leave to File Oversized Motion for Relief from Non-Dispositive Pretrial Order under Civ. L.R. 72-2 Re 964 Order on Motion for Sanction. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2017)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 965 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying 546 Discovery Letter Brief re Interpreter Costs; denying 597 Discovery Letter Brief re Deposition Schedule; granting in part and denying in part 895 Discovery Letter Brief re Luca Ferri's Costs.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2017)
December 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 964 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying 731 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2016)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 949 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 939 Motion for Modification of Court's Nov. 4, 2016 Order.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2016)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 943 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu re 940 Motion to Shorten Time.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2016)
October 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 924 ORDER . Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 10/28/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2016) Modified on 10/28/2016 to correct typo (ndrS, COURT STAFF).
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 921 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying 916 Motion to Continue Hearing. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2016)
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 915 ORDER. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 10/19/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2016)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 901 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting in part and denying in part 168 Motion for Protective Order. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2016)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 899 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 898 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2016)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 894 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 10/3/2016. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 9/26/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2016)
September 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 888 ORDER re 626 , 857 Administrative Motions to File Under Seal filed by Almawave USA Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 9/02/2016. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2016)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 884 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 858 Motion for Sanctions re Depositions of Plaintiff's Witnesses. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2016)
July 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 850 ORDER to Provide Information re Plaintiff's Compliance with Discovery Order # 640 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 07/21/2016. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2016)
July 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 839 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING 707 MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NONDISPOSITIVE ORDER DKT. NO. 665 . (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2016)
July 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 826 ORDER re 813 Notice (Other), filed by Almawave USA Inc., 815 Statement, filed by Almawave S.r.l., Almawave USA Inc., Almaviva S.p.A. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 07/13/2016. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2016)
July 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 795 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 459 Motion to Enforce Court Order re Plaintiff's Trade Secret Disclosure.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2016)
July 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 778 ORDER re 584 Discovery Letter BriefRe Loop's Lack of Compliance with the Court's Orders regarding Loop's Document Production filed by Almawave USA Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 07/04/2016. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/4/2016)
June 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 765 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 714 Administrative Motion for Leave to File Unilateral Letter Brief re Expert Depositions; finding as moot 727 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2016)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 723 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 485 Third Party WI Harper Group's Motion to Quash. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2016)
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 720 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 545 Motion to Compel Deposition of Roberto Pieraccini. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2016)
June 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 717 ORDER RE: EXHIBITS ATTACHED TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION TO DISMISS; STRIKING INDEX TO PERSONAL JURISDICTION APPENDIX ( 650 , 651 ). Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 6/2/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2016)
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 712 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING PLAINTIFFS 688 EMERGENCY MOTION TO STAY AND 700 MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM MAGISTRATES NONDISPOSITIVE ORDER. (This order also terminates docket no. 689 . )(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2016)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 703 ORDER RE: FEES ON FEES Re 660 , [678, 681 . Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 5/24/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2016)
May 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 695 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting in part and denying in part 643 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2016)
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 680 ORDER re 540 Order to Show Cause, 576 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Loop AI Labs Inc, Denying as Moot: 630 Discovery Letter Brief for Leave to File Unilateral Letter Brief to Compel Loop to Supplement its Privilege Log filed by Almawave USA Inc., 498 Discovery Letter Brief for Leave to File Unilateral Letter Brief to Compel Loop's Production of Documents over Claims of Privilege filed by Almawave USA Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 05/13/2016. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 675 ORDER to Submit Supplemental Information re Subpoenas, re 519 Discovery Letter Brief re Dkt. 514, Order granting Almawave USA, Inc. leave to file unilateral Letter Brief re Fabio Ficano deposition filed by Almawave USA Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 05/12/16. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2016)
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 668 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu re Weekly Meet and Confer Teleconferences, denying 645 Administrative Motion.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2016)
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 660 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 258 MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 5/9/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2016)
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 648 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting in part and denying in part 592 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel re Defendant Gatti; granting in part and denying in part 594 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel re Defendant IQSystem, LLC. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2016)
May 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 640 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting in part and denying in part 518 Discovery Letter Brief (Almawave USA Inc.'s Motion to Compel re Requests for Production); granting 547 Discovery Letter Brief (Almawave USA Inc.'s Motion to Compel re Interrogatories). (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2016)
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 633 ORDER Striking Plaintiff's Declaration and Attached Exhibits Supporting Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss; Order to Show Cause. (hsglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2016)
April 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 625 ORDER re 542 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Leave to File Unilateral Letter Briefs re Defendants' productions and testimonies pursuant to Court's Order at Dkt. 222 filed by Loop AI Labs Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 04/26/2016. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2016)
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 613 ORDER re 580 Administrative Motion for Leave to File Unilateral Letter Brief re Loop's Subpoena to The Pike Company, American Express Company, U.S. Bancorp, and Wells Fargo & Company filed by IQSystem, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 04/20/2016. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2016)
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 582 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting in part and denying in part 542 Plaintiff's Administrative Motion for Leave to File Unilateral Discovery Letters.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2016)
April 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 572 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying 568 Emergency Application. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2016)
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 564 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 531 Discovery Letter Brief; granting 555 Discovery Letter Brief.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2016)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 540 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 4/5/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 03/29/2016. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2016)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 533 ORDER DENYING 529 MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NONDISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER AT DKT. NO. 526. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 3/28/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2016)
March 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 527 ORDER re 521 Discovery Letter Brieffor Leave to File Unilateral Letter Brief to Compel Compliance with Order Re: Deposition of Roberto Pieraccini filed by Almawave USA Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 03/25/2016. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2016)
March 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 513 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 495 Leave to File Unilateral Discovery Letter Brief re Plaintiff's Objections to Almawave's Requests for Production.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2016)
March 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 501 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying 474 Motion for Leave to File; denying 475 Motion for Leave to File; denying 476 Motion for Leave to File; Order re 483 Plaintiff's "Notice" re document production.(dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2016)
March 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 473 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 468 Motion for Leave to File Unilateral Letter Brief re Pieraccini's Deposition. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2016)
March 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 466 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting in part and denying in part 336 Plaintiff's motion for a protective order.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2016)
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 461 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu Regarding Ex Parte Discovery Submissions; denying discovery matters 446 , 451 , 452 .(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2016)
March 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 438 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 428 Discovery Letter Brief re Plaintiff's Interrogatory Response.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2016)
February 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 437 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting in part and denying in part 295 Defendants' Motion for Protective Order as to Five Subpoenas.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2016)
February 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 430 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting in part and denying in part 169 Third Party Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP's Motion for Protective Order.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2016)
February 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 415 ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. (hsglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2016)
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 411 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 2/18/2016; Discovery due by 3/29/2016; Motions due by 5/31/2016; Motion Hearing set for 7/21/2016 02:00 PM before Hon. Haywood S Gilliam Jr.; Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/30/2016 03:00 PM; Jury Selection /Jury Trial (10-day)set for 9/19/2016 08:30 AM before Hon. Haywood S Gilliam Jr. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 2/3/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2016)
January 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 402 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING 199 MOTION TO DISQUALIFY. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2016)
January 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 401 NOTICE OF AMENDED DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 1/27/16. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2016)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 399 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 391 Motion for Leave to File Separate Discovery Letter. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2016)
January 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 389 ORDER re 386 Objection filed by Anna Gatti, 385 Notice (Other) filed by Loop AI Labs Inc, 384 Objection, filed by Loop AI Labs Inc, 383 Notice (Other) filed by Almawave USA Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 01/15/2016. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2016)
January 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 382 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu re 379 Discovery Letter Brief re Jurisdictional Discovery.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2016)
January 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 377 Second ORDER re Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 01/13/2016. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2016)
January 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 374 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu re 369 Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to Compel Jurisdictional Discovery.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2016)
January 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 367 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu provisionally granting 359 Motion for Leave to File.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2016)
January 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 355 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu re 337 Administrative Motion. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2016)
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 334 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 325 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Eric A. Lerner, Healy LLC (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2015)
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 330 ORDER Re Almawave USA's in camera Submission. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/17/2015. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2015)
December 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDER re 12/10/2015 Discovery Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/7/2015. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2015)
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORDER re 309 Letter filed by IQSystems, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/4/2015. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2015)
November 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Denying 296 Motion For Leave. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2015)
October 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER re 274 Letter filed by Loop AI Labs Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/21/2015. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2015)
October 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying 224 Motion for Leave to File; denying 239 Motion for Leave to File; denying 241 Discovery Letter Brief; denying 247 Motion for Leave to File; denying 248 Motion for Leave to File; denying 249 Motion for Leave to File; denying 257 Motion for Leave to File; denying 265 Motion for Leave to File. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2015)
October 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER to Submit Audio Recordings of Meet and Confer Sessions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/07/2015. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2015)
October 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE (terminating 196 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2015)
September 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu re Ex Parte Discovery Letters. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2015)
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 212 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu re Discovery Letter Briefs 192 , 193 , 205 .(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2015)
September 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu re 172 Discovery Letter Brief. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2015)
September 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 191 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Bryan J. Wolin, Esq. (Healy LLC). (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2015)
September 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 60 MOTION TO DISMISS (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2015)
August 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER re 172 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Almawave USA Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 08/25/2015. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2015)
August 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 171 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying 167 Motion for Reconsideration.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2015)
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 165 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying 162 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2015)
August 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER re 161 Letter filed by Loop AI Labs Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 08/11/2015. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2015)
July 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER re Attendance at Discovery Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 07/17/2015. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2015)
July 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER re Discovery Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 07/17/2015. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2015)
July 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER Setting Telephonic Discovery Management Conference. Telephonic Discovery Hearing set for 7/23/2015 at 2:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 07/15/2015. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2015)
June 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 117 Notice of Reference and Order re Discovery Procedures by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu re 112 Discovery Letter Brief.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2015)
June 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER Granting 109 Substitution of Attorney. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 6/9/2015. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2015)
June 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 105 SCHEDULING ORDER Re 100 . Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 6/5/2015. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2015)
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 82 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 62 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 59 . Responses due by 5/10/2015. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2015)
April 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. REGARDING LOOP AI INC.S MOTIONS FOR CLARIFICATION AND RECONSIDERATION. (terminating 47 Motion to Clarify; denying 48 Motion for Leave to File). (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2015)
March 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING PLAINTIFFS 9 MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. (terminating 28 Motion for Leave to File) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2015)
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REGARDING SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS RE 14 , 19 . Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 3/6/2015. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2015)
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REGARDING EX PARTE 9 MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 3/4/2015. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2015)
February 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 3 Motion for Pro Hac Vice; Terminating 7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Loop AI Labs, Inc. v. Gatti et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loop AI Labs Inc
Represented By: Valeria Calafiore Healy
Represented By: Daniel Justin Weinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anna Gatti
Represented By: Thomas J. LoSavio
Represented By: James Francis Regan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Almaviva S.p.A
Represented By: Angel A. Garganta
Represented By: Thomas Edward Wallerstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Almawave S.r.l.
Represented By: Angel A. Garganta
Represented By: Thomas Edward Wallerstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Almawave USA Inc.
Represented By: Angel A. Garganta
Represented By: Thomas Edward Wallerstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IQSystem LLC
Represented By: Thomas J. LoSavio
Represented By: James Francis Regan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IQSystem, Inc.
Represented By: Stefano Abbasciano
Represented By: Michael Paul Purcell
Represented By: Antonio Valla, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?