Feaver et al v. Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Feaver, Rose Feaver, Myungshun Shim and Artin Adamian
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. and Kaiser Foundation Hospitals
Case Number: 3:2015cv00890
Filed: February 26, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Referring Judge: Edward M Chen
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #62 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2016)
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #56 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2016)
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #57 Motion for Settlement and Dismissal of Lawsuit(bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2016)
July 20, 2016 Filing 65 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Notice of Settlement and Dismissal of Lawsuit filed by Artin Adamian, Rose Feaver, Myungshun Shim. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Stipulation Regarding Notice of Settlement and Dismissal of Lawsuit, #2 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation Regarding Notice of Settlement and Dismissal of Lawsuit, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Littlefield, Prescott) (Filed on 7/20/2016)
June 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER Re Notice. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/22/2016. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2016)
June 21, 2016 Filing 63 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Edward M. Chen: Motion Hearing held on 6/21/2016 re #57 MOTION for Settlement Approval filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. Class notice and proposed order due 7/1/16.Total Time in Court 21 minutes. Court Reporter Name Kathy Wyatt. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/21/2016)
June 16, 2016 Filing 62 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Artin Adamian, Rose Feaver, Myungshun Shim. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Prescott W. Littlefield in Support of Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Littlefield, Prescott) (Filed on 6/16/2016)
June 16, 2016 Filing 61 Supplemental Brief re #59 Order, #60 Order on Notice Issue filed byKaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. (Related document(s) #59 , #60 ) (Rowley, Christian) (Filed on 6/16/2016)
June 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER re Supplemental Briefing. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/13/2016. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2016)
June 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER Re Supplemental Briefing. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/10/2016. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2016)
May 9, 2016 Filing 58 CLERK'S NOTICE resetting 57] MOTION for Settlement Approval and Status Conference from 6/16/2016 to 6/21/16 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Status Conference set for 6/21/2016 01:30 PM. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.), (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2016)
May 9, 2016 Filing 57 MOTION for Settlement Approval filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/16/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 5/23/2016. Replies due by 5/31/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rowley, Christian) (Filed on 5/9/2016)
May 9, 2016 Filing 56 First Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Redacted Rowley Dec., #2 Declaration Unredacted Rowley Dec., #3 Proposed Order Stip and Prop. Order)(Rowley, Christian) (Filed on 5/9/2016)
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #54 Motion to postpone all imminent deadlines.(bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2016)
March 30, 2016 Filing 54 Joint MOTION to Postpone Deadlines to Facilitate Finalization of Tentative Settlement and [Proposed] Order filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., Kaiser Foundation Hospitals. Responses due by 4/13/2016. Replies due by 4/20/2016. (Rowley, Christian) (Filed on 3/30/2016)
March 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #52 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION filed by Myungshun Shim, Artin Adamian, Rose Feaver. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/2/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2016)
March 1, 2016 Filing 52 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION filed by Artin Adamian, Rose Feaver, Myungshun Shim. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Littlefield, Prescott) (Filed on 3/1/2016)
February 27, 2016 Filing 51 Transcript of Proceedings of the official sound recording held on 02/18/16, before Judge Edward M. Chen. FTR/Transcriber Echo Reporting, Inc., telephone number (858) 453-7590.;echoreporting@yahoo.com. Tape Number: FTR 10:49 - 11:25. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #50 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 3/21/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/29/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/27/2016. (Related documents(s) #50 ) (tgb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2016)
February 26, 2016 Filing 50 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., Kaiser Foundation Hospitals for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Allen, Jason) (Filed on 2/26/2016)
February 24, 2016 Filing 49 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION filed by Artin Adamian, Rose Feaver, Myungshun Shim. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Littlefield, Prescott) (Filed on 2/24/2016)
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 2/19/2016. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2016)
February 19, 2016 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler for Discovery (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2016)
February 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Selection set for 12/4/2017 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. 12 court day Jury Trial set for 12/4/2017 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Motion Hearing set for 5/18/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Pretrial Conference set for 11/7/2017 02:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Discovery due by 11/15/2016. Jury Trial set for 12/5/2017 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Motion Hearing set for 8/24/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Jury Trial set for 12/6/2017 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Jury Trial set for 12/8/2017 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Jury Trial set for 12/11/2017 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Jury Trial set for 12/12/2017 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Jury Trial set for 12/13/2017 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Jury Trial set for 12/15/2017 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Jury Trial set for 12/18/2017 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Jury Trial set for 12/19/2017 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Jury Trial set for 12/20/2017 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Jury Trial set for 12/22/2017 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/18/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2016)
February 18, 2016 Filing 46 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Edward M. Chen: Further Case Management Conference held on 2/18/2016. Status Report due by 6/16/2016. Status Conference set for 6/23/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. 12 court day jury trial set for 12/7/17 at 8:30 a.m.FTR Time 10:49-11:25. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/18/2016)
February 18, 2016 Filing 45 Transcript of Proceedings held on January 5, 2016, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, CRR, RDR, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov, telephone number (415)373-2529. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #44 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/18/2016. (Related documents(s) #44 ) (Ball, Belle) (Filed on 2/18/2016)
February 17, 2016 Filing 44 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Allen, Jason) (Filed on 2/17/2016)
February 16, 2016 Filing 43 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION filed by Artin Adamian, Rose Feaver, Myungshun Shim. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Littlefield, Prescott) (Filed on 2/16/2016)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #40 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING DEADLINE TO SUBMIT JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/16/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2016)
February 11, 2016 Filing 41 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., Kaiser Foundation Hospitals. (Rowley, Christian) (Filed on 2/11/2016)
February 10, 2016 Filing 40 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING DEADLINE TO SUBMIT JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. (Rowley, Christian) (Filed on 2/10/2016)
January 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting #33 Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Certification. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2016)
January 5, 2016 Filing 38 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Edward M. Chen: Motion Hearing held on 1/5/2016 re #33 MOTION to Certify Class Motion for Conditional Certification filed by Myungshun Shim, Artin Adamian, Rose Feaver. Under submission. Further Case Management Conference reset from 2/9/2016 to 2/18/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 2/11/2016.Court Reporter Name Belle Ball. Plaintiff Attorney Prescott Littlefield and Thomas Keaney. Defendant Attorney Richard Alfred and Jessica Lieberman. This is a text only Minute Entry (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/5/2016)
January 4, 2016 Filing 37 CLERK'S NOTICE resetting Further Case Management Conference from 2/4/2016 to 2/9/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 2/2/2016. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2016)
December 8, 2015 Filing 36 REPLY (re #33 MOTION to Certify Class Motion for Conditional Certification ) filed byArtin Adamian, Rose Feaver, Myungshun Shim. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Kearney, Thomas) (Filed on 12/8/2015)
December 3, 2015 Filing 35 CLERK'S NOTICE resetting #33 MOTION to Certify Class from 12/17/15 to 1/5/16 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Briefing schedule remains the same as previously set. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
November 24, 2015 Filing 34 RESPONSE (re #33 MOTION to Certify Class Motion for Conditional Certification ) filed byKaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., Kaiser Foundation Hospitals. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jessica Lieberman ISO Defendants' Opposition to Motion for Conditional Certification (wExhibits A and B), #2 Exhibit C and D to Declaration of Jessica Lieberman, #3 Exhibit E-H to Declaration of Jessica Lieberman, #4 Declaration of James E. Pearch ISO Defendants' Opposition to Motion for Conditional Certification, #5 Proposed Order Denying Motion for Conditional Certification)(Rowley, Christian) (Filed on 11/24/2015)
October 15, 2015 Filing 33 MOTION to Certify Class Motion for Conditional Certification filed by Artin Adamian, Rose Feaver, Myungshun Shim. Motion Hearing set for 12/17/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 11/24/2015. Replies due by 12/8/2015. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Conditional Certification, #2 Declaration of Prescott W. Littlefield in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Certification, #3 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Prescott W. Littlefield, #4 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Prescott W. Littlefield, #5 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Prescott W. Littlefield, #6 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Prescott W. Littlefield, #7 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Prescott W. Littlefield, #8 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Prescott W. Littlefield, #9 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Prescott W. Littlefield, #10 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Prescott W. Littlefield, #11 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Prescott W. Littlefield, #12 Exhibit 10 to Declaration of Prescott W. Littlefield, #13 Exhibit 11 to Declaration of Prescott W. Littlefield (Part 1 of 2), #14 Exhibit 11 to Declaration of Prescott W. Littlefield (Part 2 of 2), #15 Exhibit 12 to Declaration of Prescott W. Littlefield, #16 Exhibit 13 to Declaration of Prescott W. Littlefield, #17 Exhibit 14 to to Declaration of Prescott W. Littlefield, #18 Exhibit 15 to Declaration of Prescott W. Littlefield, #19 Exhibit 16 to Declaration of Prescott W. Littlefield, #20 Exhibit 17 to Declaration of Prescott W. Littlefield, #21 Exhibit 18 to Declaration of Prescott W. Littlefield (Part 1 of 10), #22 Exhibit 18 to Declaration of Prescott W. Littlefield (Part 2 of 10), #23 Exhibit 18 to Declaration of Prescott W. Littlefield (Part 3 of 10), #24 Exhibit 18 to Declaration of Prescott W. Littlefield (Part 4 of 10), #25 Exhibit 18 to Declaration of Prescott W. Littlefield (Part 5 of 10), #26 Exhibit 18 to Declaration of Prescott W. Littlefield (Part 6 of 10), #27 Exhibit 18 to Declaration of Prescott W. Littlefield (Part 7 of 10), #28 Exhibit 18 to Declaration of Prescott W. Littlefield (Part 8 of 10), #29 Exhibit 18 to Declaration of Prescott W. Littlefield (Part 9 of 10), #30 Exhibit 18 to Declaration of Prescott W. Littlefield (Part 10 of 10), #31 Exhibit 19 to Declaration of Prescott W. Littlefield, #32 Exhibit 20 to Declaration of Prescott W. Littlefield, #33 Exhibit 21 to Declaration of Prescott W. Littlefield, #34 Exhibit 22 to Declaration of Prescott W. Littlefield (Part 1 of 2), #35 Exhibit 22 to Declaration of Prescott W. Littlefield (Part 2 of 2), #36 Exhibit 23 to Declaration of Prescott W. Littlefield, #37 Exhibit 24 to Declaration of Prescott W. Littlefield, #38 Exhibit 25 to Declaration of Prescott W. Littlefield (Part 1 of 2), #39 Exhibit 25 to Declaration of Prescott W. Littlefield (Part 2 of 2), #40 Exhibit 26 to Declaration of Prescott W. Littlefield, #41 Exhibit 27 to Declaration of Prescott W. Littlefield, #42 Exhibit 28 to Declaration of Prescott W. Littlefield, #43 Declaration of Rose Feaver in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Certification, #44 Declaration of Artin Adamian in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Certification, #45 Declaration of Myungshun Shim in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Certification, #46 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Conditional Certification FLSA Collective Action Certification And Issuance of Notice, #47 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Littlefield, Prescott) (Filed on 10/15/2015)
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #30 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR STANDARD LITIGATION filed by Myungshun Shim, Artin Adamian, Rose Feaver. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/27/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2015)
August 27, 2015 Set/Reset Hearing Further Case Management Conference set for 2/4/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2015)
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #29 TO CONTINUE BRIEFING AND HEARING FOR CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION filed by Myungshun Shim, Artin Adamian, Rose Feaver Case Management Statement due by 1/28/2016. Further Case Management Conference reset for 2/4/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Conditional Class Certification Motion Hearing set for 12/17/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/27/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2015) Modified on 8/27/2015 (bpf, COURT STAFF).
August 26, 2015 Filing 30 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER re STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR STANDARD LITIGATION filed by Artin Adamian, Rose Feaver, Myungshun Shim. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Littlefield, Prescott) (Filed on 8/26/2015)
August 25, 2015 Filing 29 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #25 Case Management Conference - Initial,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, TO CONTINUE BRIEFING AND HEARING FOR CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION filed by Artin Adamian, Rose Feaver, Myungshun Shim. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Littlefield, Prescott) (Filed on 8/25/2015)
August 6, 2015 Filing 28 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., Kaiser Foundation Hospitals for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Rowley, Christian) (Filed on 8/6/2015)
August 5, 2015 Filing 27 Transcript of Proceedings held on 06/04/2015, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leo T. Mankiewicz, CSR, RMR, CRR, Telephone number (415) 722-7045; email: leomank@gmail.com. FTR 10:07 a.m. - 10:26 a.m. = 19 minutes. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #26 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 8/26/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/8/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/3/2015. (Related documents(s) #26 ) (Mankiewicz, Leo) (Filed on 8/5/2015)
July 30, 2015 Filing 26 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Artin Adamian, Rose Feaver, Myungshun Shim for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Littlefield, Prescott) (Filed on 7/30/2015)
June 5, 2015 Filing 25 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Edward M. Chen: Initial Case Management Conference held on 6/4/2015. Case Management Statement due by 11/5/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/12/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Motion for Conditional Class Certification Hearing set for 11/12/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen.FTR Time 10:07-10:26. Attachment Minute order.(bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/5/2015)
June 4, 2015 Filing 24 Request for Judicial Notice Submission of State Court Order for Judicial Notice filed byKaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., Kaiser Foundation Hospitals. (Rowley, Christian) (Filed on 6/4/2015)
May 26, 2015 Filing 23 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Artin Adamian, Rose Feaver, Myungshun Shim. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Littlefield, Prescott) (Filed on 5/26/2015)
May 18, 2015 Filing 22 Certificate of Interested Entities by Artin Adamian, Rose Feaver, Myungshun Shim (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Littlefield, Prescott) (Filed on 5/18/2015)
April 21, 2015 Filing 21 Defendants' ANSWER to Amended Complaint byKaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. (Rowley, Christian) (Filed on 4/21/2015)
April 8, 2015 Filing 20 CLERK'S NOTICE - The hearing on Defendant's motion to dismiss (Docket No. 15) set for April 30, 2015 is hereby vacated in light of Plaintiffs' filing of an amended complaint. See Docket No. 18. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY; THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE.(bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2015)
April 8, 2015 Filing 19 RESPONSE (re #15 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Collective and Class Action Complaint ) filed byArtin Adamian, Rose Feaver, Myungshun Shim. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Stonebarger, Gene) (Filed on 4/8/2015)
April 6, 2015 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Collective and Class Action Complaint against Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., Kaiser Foundation Hospitals. Filed byArtin Adamian, Rose Feaver, Myungshun Shim. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to First Amended Collective and Class Action Complaint, #2 Exhibit B to First Amended Collective and Class Action Complaint, #3 Exhibit C to First Amended Collective and Class Action Complaint, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Stonebarger, Gene) (Filed on 4/6/2015)
April 1, 2015 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Artin Adamian, Rose Feaver, Myungshun Shim re #16 Case Management Scheduling Order, (Lambert, Richard) (Filed on 4/1/2015)
March 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 5/28/2015. Case Management Conference set for 6/4/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/31/15. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2015)
March 26, 2015 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Collective and Class Action Complaint filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/30/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 4/9/2015. Replies due by 4/16/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss)(Rowley, Christian) (Filed on 3/26/2015)
March 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/26/15. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2015)
March 25, 2015 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2015)
March 24, 2015 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., Kaiser Foundation Hospitals.. (Rowley, Christian) (Filed on 3/24/2015)
March 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting #9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice re Jessica Schauer Lieberman. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2015)
March 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting #8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice re Richard L. Alfred. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2015)
March 13, 2015 Filing 9 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Jessica Lieberman ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9358329.) filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., Kaiser Foundation Hospitals. (Rowley, Christian) (Filed on 3/13/2015)
March 13, 2015 Filing 8 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Richard L. Alfred ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9358297.) filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., Kaiser Foundation Hospitals. (Rowley, Christian) (Filed on 3/13/2015)
March 12, 2015 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons; Complaint; Civil Cover Sheet; Order Setting Initial Case Management Conference and ADR Deadlines; Civil Standing Order for Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James served on Kaiser Foundation Hospitals on 03/05/2015, filed by Artin Adamian, Rose Feaver, Myungshun Shim. (Stonebarger, Gene) (Filed on 3/12/2015)
March 12, 2015 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons; Complaint; Civil Case Cover Sheet; Order Setting Initial Case Management Conference and ADR Deadlines; Civil Standing Order for Magistrate Maria-Elena James served on Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. on 03/05/2015, filed by Artin Adamian, Rose Feaver, Myungshun Shim. (Stonebarger, Gene) (Filed on 3/12/2015)
March 2, 2015 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., Kaiser Foundation Hospitals. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2015)
March 2, 2015 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/21/2015. Case Management Conference set for 5/28/2015 10:00 AM. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2015)
February 27, 2015 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2015)
February 26, 2015 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Stonebarger, Gene) (Filed on 2/26/2015)
February 26, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-9319247.). Filed byArtin Adamian, Rose Feaver, Myungshun Shim. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stonebarger, Gene) (Filed on 2/26/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Feaver et al v. Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.
Represented By: Jessica S. Lieberman,
Represented By: Gene J. Stonebarger
Represented By: Prescott Wayne Littlefield
Represented By: Richard David Lambert
Represented By: Richard Lee Alfred
Represented By: Jason Michael Allen
Represented By: Thomas Andrew Kearney
Represented By: Christian Joseph Rowley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Hospitals
Represented By: Jessica S. Lieberman,
Represented By: Richard Lee Alfred
Represented By: Jason Michael Allen
Represented By: Christian Joseph Rowley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Feaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Feaver
Represented By: Prescott Wayne Littlefield
Represented By: Thomas Andrew Kearney
Represented By: Gene J. Stonebarger
Represented By: Richard David Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myungshun Shim
Represented By: Prescott Wayne Littlefield
Represented By: Thomas Andrew Kearney
Represented By: Gene J. Stonebarger
Represented By: Richard David Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Artin Adamian
Represented By: Prescott Wayne Littlefield
Represented By: Thomas Andrew Kearney
Represented By: Gene J. Stonebarger
Represented By: Richard David Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?