Buchla v. Buchla Electronic Musical Instrument, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Donald Buchla
Defendant: Buchla Electronic Musical Instrument, LLC, Audio Supermarket Pty. LTD., Danny Olesh, Michael Marans, Lewis Chiodo and John Fuller
Case Number: 3:2015cv00921
Filed: February 27, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 18, 2016 48 Opinion or Order of the Court CONDITIONAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL. ***Civil Case Terminated.*** Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 8/18/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2016)
July 21, 2015 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING 26 Motion to Compel Arbitration. (hsglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2015)
June 17, 2015 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 41 Stipulated Protective Order for Standard Litigation. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2015)
May 27, 2015 39 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER re 38 . Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/17/2016 03:00 PM. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 5/27/2015. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2015)
May 14, 2015 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 33 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration, 26 First MOTION to Compel Arbitration. Responses due by 5/21/2015; Replies due by 6/4/2015. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 5/14/2015. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2015)
May 11, 2015 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 30 Stipulation Selecting ADR Process. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 5/11/2015. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2015)
April 14, 2015 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 24 Stipulation to Waive Service and Continue Responsive Pleading Date. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2015)
March 24, 2015 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE CITIZENSHIP OF PARTIES. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 3/24/2015. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buchla v. Buchla Electronic Musical Instrument, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Buchla
Represented By: Timothy David Byron
Represented By: David R. Eberhart
Represented By: Jesse Jon Koehler
Represented By: Diana Catherine Rogosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buchla Electronic Musical Instrument, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Audio Supermarket Pty. LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Olesh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Marans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lewis Chiodo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?