Federal Trade Commission v. DIRECTV, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission
Defendant: DIRECTV, Inc. and DIRECTV LLC
Case Number: 3:2015cv01129
Filed: March 11, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:53
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 428 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 427 Stipulation Voluntarily Dismissing Action. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2018)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 419 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 418 Stipulation Re: Request to Postpone CMC.Case Management Conference set for 10/2/2018 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2018)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 417 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 396 MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON PARTIAL FINDINGS; FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Case Management Conference set for 9/4/2018 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2018)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 408 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING 406 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMICUS BRIEF. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 395 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 394 Stipulation REGARDING ADMISSIBILITY OF CERTAIN ONBOARDING DOCUMENTS. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2017)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 391 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 384 Stipulation TO ADMIT CERTAIN PRINT ADS. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2017)
August 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 357 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., Re: 253 323 333 339 Pretrial Motions and 348 Joint Submission of Examination Time Estimates for Trial Witnesses. (hsglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2017)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 352 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 351 Stipulation Permitting the Parties to Bring Additional Technology into the Courthouse. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2017)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Denying 331 Administrative Motion FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY ISO DIRECTV'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED ANSWER. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2017)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 312 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 298 DIRECTV's request to seal certain trial exhibits. (hsglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2017)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 304 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 303 Stipulation Regarding Admissibility of Certain Trial Exhibits. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2017)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 301 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 300 Administrative Motion Requesting Leave To File Statements Regarding Certain Evidentiary Disputes. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2017)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 297 Stipulation Permitting the Parties to Bring Additional Technology into the Courthouse. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2017)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 288 Stipulation Permitting the Parties to Bring Additional Technology into the Courthouse. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2017)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER RE: FTC'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS; RE: MOTIONS TO SEAL. Motions terminated: 219 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Certain Exhibits in Support of Opposition to FTC's Motion Under Rule 37(e)(1) filed by DIRECTV LL C, DIRECTV, Inc., 206 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Federal Trade Commission, 207 MOTION for Sanctions Under Rule 37(e)(1) filed by Federal Trade Commission, 211 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by DIRECTV LLC, DIRECTV, Inc. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/21/2016. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2016)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 230 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Patricia K. Dolan-Galaviz. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2016)
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 226 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Marketos, Peter. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2016)
December 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 222 Stipulation to extend expert discovery: Close of Expert Discovery due by 12/23/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2016)
November 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 176 the Federal Trade Commission's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (hsglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2016)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 209 Administrative Motion For Extension of Time to File Declaration in Support of Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to file Under Seal. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2016)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER to file chart. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. (hsglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2016)
November 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 205 Discovery Order re Dkt. No. 203 . Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/2/2016. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2016)
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 198 Stipulation to Extend Time for Rebuttal Report. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2016)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 182 Stipulation To Extend Time for Rebuttal and Reply Expert Reports and Expert Discovery. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2016)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 179 Motion for Extension of Time to File. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2016)
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. denying 53 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 78 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 119 Motion for Leave to File Supplementary Material. (hsglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2016)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 169 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Benjamin M. Mundel. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2016)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 166 Discovery Order re Dkt. Nos. 158 , 161 , 165 . Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/5/2016. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2016)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 163 Stipulation. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2016)
July 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER FOR PARTIES TO APPEAR FOR COURTROOM MEET AND CONFER SESSION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/20/2016. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2016)
July 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 154 Stipulation to extend discovery deadlines. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2016)
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 156 Discovery Order re: Letter Brief 152 . Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/15/2016. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2016)
June 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 149 Discovery Order re: 148 Discovery Letter Brief Regarding FTC RFP No. 2. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/10/2016. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2016)
June 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 147 Discovery Order re: 146 Joint Discovery Letter Brief. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/9/2016. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2016)
May 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 145 Discovery Order re: 143 Discovery Letter Brief. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/3/2016. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2016)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING 126 MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NONDISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2016)
April 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 135 Stipulation Extend Case Deadlines. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2016)
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 133 Discovery Order re: 130 Discovery Letter Brief re FTC 30(b)(6) Topic 1. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/6/2016. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2016)
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 131 Discovery Order re: 127 Discovery Letter Brief regarding FTC RFP 12 and 13. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/4/2016. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2016)
March 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 122 Discovery Order re: 121 Discovery Letter Brief re: Solis Deposition. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/16/2016. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2016)
March 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 117 Discovery Order re: 113 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Federal Trade Commission. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/8/2016. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2016)
March 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 110 Ex Parte Request to use the EEPS and bring electronic equipment into the courthouse.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2016)
February 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 109 Discovery Order re: 106 Discovery Letter Brief. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/24/2016. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2016)
February 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 108 Discovery Order re: 107 Discovery Letter Brief Regarding DIRECTV 30(b)(6) Topic 1. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/18/2016. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2016)
February 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 104 Stipulation Re 101 Clerk's Notice, Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Continuing Case Management Conference. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2016)
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 97 Stipulation Re: Summary Judgment Hearing Date. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2016)
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Discovery Order re 89 Letter filed by DIRECTV LLC. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/5/2016. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2016)
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS 32 MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2015)
December 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 84 Stipulation ontinuing the Deadline for DIRECTV to File its Reply Brief in Support of its 53 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Continuing Hearing on 53 Motion for Partial Summary Jugdment (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2015)
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 81 Discovery Order re: 56 Joint Discovery Letter Brief, 66 Joint Discovery Letter Brief, 70 Joint Discovery Letter. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/3/2015. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2015)
October 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION'S 58 MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DIRECTV'S 53 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DENYING FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION'S 60 MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME FOR EXTENSION. Responses due by 11/24/2015; Replies due by 12/22/2015. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2015)
October 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 52 Stipulation Re: Discovery of Electronically Stored Information. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2015)
July 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 7/1/2015. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Trade Commission v. DIRECTV, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission
Represented By: Eric David Edmondson
Represented By: Raymond Edward McKown
Represented By: Stacy Rene Procter
Represented By: Jacob Adam Snow
Represented By: Erika Ruth Wodinsky
Represented By: Boris Yankilovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIRECTV, Inc.
Represented By: Christian Edward Baker
Represented By: Chad S. Hummel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIRECTV LLC
Represented By: Christian Edward Baker
Represented By: Chad S. Hummel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?