Reorganized California Power Exchange Corporation v. Pacific Gas and Electric Company
Appellant: Reorganized California Power Exchange Corporation
Appellee: Pacific Gas and Electric Company
Trustee: William T. Neary
Case Number: 3:2015cv01141
Filed: March 11, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Appeal
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 51 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/14/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2015)
November 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFS by Hon. William Alsup granting 44 Ex Parte Application.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2015)
September 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER RESCHEDULING HEARING Motion Hearing set for 10/21/2015 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/18/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2015)
July 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER RE STIPULATION RE EXTENSION OF TIME FOR FILING APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF ON APPEAL by Hon. William Alsup granting 26 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2015)
June 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE of Sheldon Solow by Hon. William Alsup granting 25 .(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2015)
June 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PDF Error, DisregardORDER DENYING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY SHELDON SOLOW by Hon. William Alsup denying 8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2015) Modified on 6/5/2015 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE STIPULATION RE APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF re 6 STIPULATION. Appellant Brief due by 6/8/2015.. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 1, 2015. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reorganized California Power Exchange Corporation v. Pacific Gas and Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Reorganized California Power Exchange Corporation
Represented By: Julie A Belezzuoli
Represented By: Alicia Marie Clough
Represented By: Marc Stephen Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Pacific Gas and Electric Company
Represented By: Gary M. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: William T. Neary
Represented By: Patricia A. Cutler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?