Amatrone et al v. Champion et al
Plaintiff: Robert Amatrone, Nick Amatrone and Marla Sharlow
Defendant: Randy Champion, State Farm Fire and Casaulty Company, Nationwide Mutual Automobile, Devin Bell, Contra Costa County District Attorney Office, Contra Costa County Fire Protection District, Contra Costa Sheriff, Contra Costa County Superior Court, San Ramon Valley Fire District and State of California Department of Insurance
Case Number: 3:2015cv01356
Filed: March 24, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS AND DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS MOOT by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying as moot 217 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 232 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2017)
August 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISQUALIFY by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying 215 Motion to Disqualify Judge. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO SUPPRESS, MOTION TO AMEND, MOTION TO STAY, AND MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS by Judge Jon S. Tigar; denying 184 Motion to Suppress; denying 185 Motion for Leave to File; denying 194 Motion to Dismiss; denying 197 Motion to Stay. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2017)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO COMPEL by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting 167 Motion to Compel. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2017)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO COMPEL by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 154 Motion to Compel; granting 158 Motion to Compel; denying 156 Request for Pro Bono Attorney. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2017)
June 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 147 SCHEDULING ORDER. Deadline to add parties or amend the pleadings 6/29/2016. Initial disclosures under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a) 7/22/2016. Fact discovery cut-off 4/22/2017. Expert disclosures 5/13/2017. Expert rebuttal 6/3/2017. Expert discovery cut-off 6/17/2017. Deadline to file dispositive motions 7/8/2017. Pretrial conference statement due 9/19/2017. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/29/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. Jury Trial set for 10/23/2017 - 11/2/2017 a t 8:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. The Case Management Conference currently scheduled for June 29, 2016 is vacated. The motion to continue that conference, ECF No. 145, is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 27, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2016)
June 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 131 Motion to Dismiss; granting 133 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2016)
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER RE: OBJECTIONS TO ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO DISMISS re 128 Objection filed by Robert Amatrone. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 18, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2016)
February 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE DEFENDANTS FOR FAILURE TO EFFECT SERVICE re 119 Order to Show Cause, 123 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Robert Amatrone. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 26, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2016)
February 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 93 Motion to Dismiss; granting 103 Motion to Dismiss. The Case Management Conference currently scheduled for February 24, 2016 is CONTINUED to May 25, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2016)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS. Show Cause Response due by 3/1/2016. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 12, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2016)
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER VACATING HEARING re 103 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Audrey Hahn, Claudiu Lupascu. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 1, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2016)
January 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER VACATING HEARING re 93 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Contra Costa County Fire Protection District, Randy Champion, Contra Costa County District Attorney Office, Contra Costa Sheriff, Devon Bell. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 19, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2016)
September 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting 60 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 61 Motion to Dismiss; granting 62 Motion to Dismiss; granting 63 Motion to Dismiss; granting 64 Motion to Dismiss; granting 65 Motion to Dismiss; granting 78 Motion to Amend/Correct; Plaintiffs are required to E-FILE the amended document. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2015)
September 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 89 MOTION to Continue filed by Contra Costa County Superior Court. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/2/2015 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 22, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2015)
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER VACATING HEARING re 63 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion; Motion to Dismiss by California Department of Insurance filed by State of California Department of Insurance, 61 First MOTION to Dismiss 1st Amended Complaint filed by Contra Costa County Fire Protection District, Devin Bell, Randy Champion, Contra Costa County District Attorney Office, Contra Costa Sheriff, 60 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Contra Costa County Superior Court, 62 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, 64 MOTION to Dismiss [Defendant Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, 78 First MOTION to Amend/Correct for a Joinder of Defendants filed by Marla Sharlow, 65 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by San Ramon Valley Fire District. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 18, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2015)
June 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER RE MOTIONS TO DISMISS re 8 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Contra Costa County Superior Court; 40 MOTION to Request Joinder of All Hearings of All defendants' Motions against Plaintiffs filed by Rober t Amatrone, Nick Amatrone, Marla Sharlow; 22 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion to Dismiss; Motion to Dismiss by California Department of Insurance filed by State of California Department of Insurance; 28 MOTION to Dismiss Co mplaint filed by San Ramon Valley Fire District; 37 MOTION to Dismiss [Defendant Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss or, Alternatively, for a More Definite Statement filed by Nationwid e Mutual Insurance Company; 32 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12b(6) filed by State Farm Fire and Casaulty Company; 26 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Contra Costa County Fire Protection District, Devin Bell, Randy Champion, Contra Costa County District Attorney Office, Contra Costa Sheriff. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 16, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2015)
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 3/23/2015 TRANSFERRING this matter to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California, Oakland Division. CASE CLOSED. (Michel, G.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amatrone et al v. Champion et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Amatrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nick Amatrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marla Sharlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Champion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casaulty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Automobile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devin Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contra Costa County District Attorney Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contra Costa County Fire Protection District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contra Costa Sheriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contra Costa County Superior Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Ramon Valley Fire District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California Department of Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?