MH Pillars LTD et al v. Carol Realini et al
Plaintiff: MH Pillars LTD and MH Pillars Inc
Defendant: Carol Realini, Rodney Robinson, Christopher Martin, Ultralight FS Inc, Omney Inc and Accelerated Commerce Solutions Inc
Case Number: 3:2015cv01383
Filed: March 25, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 126 Order by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting in part and denying in part 118 Motion to Dismiss.(pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2018)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 82 Motion to Strike; terminating 85 Motion for Sanctions without prejudice to refilling at close of case. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2017)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting in part and denying in part 81 Motion to Dismiss; granting 85 Motion to Dismiss, deferring ruling on 85 Motion for Sanctions, finding as moot 85 Motion to Strike. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2017)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 79 Motion to Disqualify Counsel.. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 AMENDED ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND DENYING MOTION FOR BOND. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 3/8/2017. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2017)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 48 Motion to Dismiss; granting 50 Motion to Dismiss; denying 51 Motion for Bond. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2017)
July 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER by Judge Hamilton terminating 35 Motion to Appear by Telephone; granting 25 Motion to Intervene (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2015)
May 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/25/2015. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/2/2015 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 5/11/15. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MH Pillars LTD et al v. Carol Realini et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MH Pillars LTD
Represented By: Peter B. Fredman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MH Pillars Inc
Represented By: Peter B. Fredman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Realini
Represented By: Sara Ahmed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney Robinson
Represented By: Sara Ahmed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Martin
Represented By: Sara Ahmed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ultralight FS Inc
Represented By: Sara Ahmed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omney Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accelerated Commerce Solutions Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?