Gary Daniel James Kennedy v. James Ruben Bedgood et al
Plaintiff: Gary Daniel James Kennedy
Defendant: James Ruben Bedgood, Ben Padilla, Kris Dee, Jake Spencer, Ryan McDonald, Santiago Castillo, John Fortner, Matthew Allendorph, Megan Miller and Jason Vanderpool
Case Number: 3:2015cv01404
Filed: March 26, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 70 FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION filed by Misty Scanlon, Gary Daniel James Kennedy. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/6/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2017)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 67 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE filed by Misty Scanlon, Gary Daniel James Kennedy. Status Report due by 6/1/2017. Status Conference set for 6/8/2017 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/5/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2017)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING STATUS. Status Report due by 5/4/2017. Status Conference set for 5/11/2017 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/27/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2017)
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANTS JASON VANDERPOOL; MATTHEW ALLENDORPH;MEGAN MILLER & JOHN FORTNER only re 59 . Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/3/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2017)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 41 Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2016)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANTS JASON VANDERPOOL; MATTHEW ALLENDORPH; & MEGAN MILLER only re 55 Proposed Order filed by Misty Scanlon, Gary Daniel James Kennedy. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/20/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2016)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 28 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Mediation Deadline and Further CMC filed by Gary Daniel James Kennedy. Case Management Statement due by 6/30/2016. Further Case Management Conference reset for 7/7/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/16/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2016)
November 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 26 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Deadline For Mediation and Continuing Further Case Management Conference filed by Ryan McDonald, James Ruben Bedgood, Megan Miller, Ben Padilla, Jake Spencer, Jason Vanderpool, John Fortner, Kris Dee, Matthew Allendorph, Santiago Castillo. Status Report due by 3/3/2016. Status Conference set for 3/10/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/24/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2015)
July 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. STIPULATION AND ORDER re 19 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Matthew Allendorph, et al. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/23/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2015)
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/17/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gary Daniel James Kennedy v. James Ruben Bedgood et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Daniel James Kennedy
Represented By: John L. Burris
Represented By: Lateef Hasani Gray
Represented By: DeWitt Marcellus Lacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Ruben Bedgood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Padilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kris Dee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jake Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santiago Castillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Fortner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Allendorph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Vanderpool
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?