Pedersen v. Bankers Life and Casualty Company et al
Plaintiff: Daniela Pedersen
Defendant: Bankers Life and Casualty Company and CNO Services, LLC
Case Number: 3:2015cv01472
Filed: March 31, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 99 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 2 RE: SECOND PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/6/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2016)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 85 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 1: INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Next Pretrial Conference set Wednesday, 10/5/2016 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/30/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2016)
March 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER AMENDING SCHEDULING ORDER; VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 39 Joint Case Management Statement filed by Bankers Life and Casualty Company, CNO Services, LLC, Daniela Pedersen, ***Deadlines terminated: VACATING 3/14/16 CMC date re 34 Order on Stipulation Amending Scheduling Order. Non-Expert Discovery cutoff is 5/6/2016. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/11/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2016)
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 28 Motion of Plaintiff's Counsel to Withdraw as Counsel and Notice to Unrepresented Parties. Court GRANTS the Motion to withdraw as counsel effective upon filing proof of service of this Order upon the Client. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2015)
October 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER re: ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/6/2015. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2015)
June 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/24/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2015)
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/7/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2015)
April 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 4/3/15. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pedersen v. Bankers Life and Casualty Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bankers Life and Casualty Company
Represented By: Johanna Rene Carney
Represented By: William Hays Weissman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNO Services, LLC
Represented By: Johanna Rene Carney
Represented By: William Hays Weissman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniela Pedersen
Represented By: Samuel Noah Kesten
Represented By: Steven Mark Kesten
Represented By: Peter Francis Lacques
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?