Center for Food Safety et al v. Vilsack et al
Plaintiff: Center for Food Safety, Beyond Pesticides, Equal Exchange, Food & Water Watch, Inc., La Montanita Co-op, Organic Seed Growers and Trade Association, The Cornucopia Institute, Northeast Organic Dairy Producers Alliance, PCC Natural Markets, Greensward/New Natives LLC, Frey Vineyards, Ltd., Maine Organic Farmers and Gardeners Association, Ohio Ecological Food and Farm Association and Organic Consumers Association
Defendant: Tom Vilsack, Anne Alonzo and Miles McEvoy
Case Number: 3:2015cv01590
Filed: April 7, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 103 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 5/24/2018. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2018)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 92 Stipulation to Set Hearing Date. Motion Hearing set for 11/9/2017 02:00 PM before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2017)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULE AND DIRECTING PARTIES TO MEET AND CONFER RE: HEARING DATE. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 6/30/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 86 Motion to Appear by Telephone at June 27, 2017 Further Case Management Conference. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2017)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING DEFENDANTS 81 MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NON-DISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2017)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting in part and denying in part 71 Motion to Compel Completion of the Administrative Record or in the Alternative, for Leave to Conduct Limited Discovery. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2017)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 68 Stipulation re Docket No. 66 . (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2017)
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 65 Stipulation on Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule. Motion due by 1/20/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2016)
September 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING 53 MOTION TO DISMISS. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2016)
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 51 Stipulation to Set Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2015)
October 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Order by Hon. Haywood S Gilliam, Jr granting 16 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (hsglc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2015)
October 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 45 Motion for Leave to File a Notice of Supplemental Authority. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2015)
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 41 Stipulation to Continue Hearing Date on Defendants' 16 Motion to Dismiss. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2015)
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 11 Stipulation to Set Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Center for Food Safety et al v. Vilsack et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Food Safety
Represented By: Paige Michele Tomaselli
Represented By: Sylvia Shih-Yau Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beyond Pesticides
Represented By: Paige Michele Tomaselli
Represented By: Sylvia Shih-Yau Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equal Exchange
Represented By: Paige Michele Tomaselli
Represented By: Sylvia Shih-Yau Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Food & Water Watch, Inc.
Represented By: Paige Michele Tomaselli
Represented By: Sylvia Shih-Yau Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: La Montanita Co-op
Represented By: Paige Michele Tomaselli
Represented By: Sylvia Shih-Yau Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Organic Seed Growers and Trade Association
Represented By: Paige Michele Tomaselli
Represented By: Sylvia Shih-Yau Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Cornucopia Institute
Represented By: Paige Michele Tomaselli
Represented By: Sylvia Shih-Yau Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northeast Organic Dairy Producers Alliance
Represented By: Paige Michele Tomaselli
Represented By: Sylvia Shih-Yau Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PCC Natural Markets
Represented By: Paige Michele Tomaselli
Represented By: Sylvia Shih-Yau Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greensward/New Natives LLC
Represented By: Paige Michele Tomaselli
Represented By: Sylvia Shih-Yau Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frey Vineyards, Ltd.
Represented By: Paige Michele Tomaselli
Represented By: Sylvia Shih-Yau Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maine Organic Farmers and Gardeners Association
Represented By: Paige Michele Tomaselli
Represented By: Sylvia Shih-Yau Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ohio Ecological Food and Farm Association
Represented By: Paige Michele Tomaselli
Represented By: Sylvia Shih-Yau Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Organic Consumers Association
Represented By: Paige Michele Tomaselli
Represented By: Sylvia Shih-Yau Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Vilsack
Represented By: Michael Andrew Zee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne Alonzo
Represented By: Michael Andrew Zee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miles McEvoy
Represented By: Michael Andrew Zee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?