Mendoza v. Hyundai Motor Company, LTD et al
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Mendoza
Defendant: Hyundai Motor Company, LTD and Hyundai Motor America, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv01685
Filed: April 14, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER APPROVING 41 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT AND CONTINUE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Amended Pleadings due by 11/12/2015. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/2/2015. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2015)
June 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER VACATING SPECIALLY SET CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/15/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2015)
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FROM JUNE 18, 2015 TO JUNE 25, 2015. Case Management Conference set for 6/25/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2015)
June 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The parties in related cases Mendoza v. Hyundai Motor Co., Ltd., et al., Case No. 15-cv-01685-BLF and Graham v. Hyundai Motor America, Inc., Case No. 15-cv-02071-BLF are ordered to appear at a Case Management Conference set for 6/18/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. All parties are authorized to appear telephonically. Counsel should arrange appearances through CourtCall in advance of the hearing. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 6/15/2015. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mendoza v. Hyundai Motor Company, LTD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Mendoza
Represented By: Jae Kook Kim
Represented By: Richard D. McCune, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph G. Sauder
Represented By: Matthew David Schelkopf
Represented By: David Christopher Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Motor Company, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Motor America, Inc.
Represented By: Shon Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?