Merriman v. Governor Jerry Brown et al.
Plaintiff: Justin Merriman
Defendant: Jerry Brown
Case Number: 3:2015cv01715
Filed: April 15, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER ON STIPULATION TO CONTINUE PRE-TRIAL DATES, Motions terminated: 101 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Pre-Trial and Trial Dates filed by Tierney. Motions due by 2/15/2017. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/12/201 7 01:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Selection set for 4/17/2017 07:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Jury Trial set for 4/17/2017 07:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/12/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2016)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO FIND PLAINTIFF INCOMPETENT & RECOMMENDING B. EPSTEIN FOR APPOINTMENT AS PLAINTIFF'S GUARDIAN AD LITEM by Hon. William Alsup granting 95 Motion.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2016)
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 98 REQUEST FOR FURTHER RESPONSE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/7/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2016)
December 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER REQUESTING DR. GLEZER'S REPORT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/1/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2016)
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING RE DEFENDANTS DISCOVERY DISPUTE BY ONE HOUR, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 89 Motion Hearing set for 11/1/2016 12:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/24/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2016)
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR A MENTAL HEALTH EXAMINATION OF PLAINTIFF JUSTIN MERRIMAN by Hon. William Alsup granting 85 .(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2016)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 84 REQUEST FOR RESPONSE RE COMPETENCE Responses due by 10/6/2016.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/22/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2016)
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT ROBINSON LEAVE TO DEPOSE INMATE WITNESS, Motions terminated: 73 Amended MOTION for Leave to Depose Inmate Witness re 71 MOTION to Take Deposition from Daniel C. Frederickson filed by Robinson, 71 MOTION to Take Deposition from Daniel C. Frederickson filed by Robinson.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/12/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2016)
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER SETTING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND DISMISSING OFFICER SMITH Further Case Management Conference set for 8/8/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/4/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2016)
July 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO SERVE OFFICER SMITH by Hon. William Alsup denying 62 Motion for Extension of Time to File.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2016)
June 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR SERVICE [re 43 MOTION for Leave to File filed by Justin Merriman, 44 MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Justin Merriman]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 6/24/2016. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2016)
June 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 REQUEST FOR INFORMATION [re 43 MOTION for Leave to File filed by Justin Merriman]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 6/21/2016. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2016)
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER ON STIPULATiON TO CONTINUE THE HEARING ON THE MOTION TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 6/7/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2016)
May 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 REQUEST FOR RESPONSE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 5/27/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2016)
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY by Hon. William Alsup granting 36 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2016)
January 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, Motions terminated: 31 MOTION to Continue filed by Justin Merriman. Case Management Statement due by 2/11/2016. Case Management Conference set for 2/18/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/19/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2016)
December 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER RE JOINT REQUEST TO CONTINUE THE DECEMBER 17, 2015 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Case Management Statement due by 1/14/2016. Case Management Conference set for 1/21/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/7/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2015)
November 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE RE DEFENDANTS' FIRST NAMES re 26 Summons Returned Unexecuted. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/24/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2015)
September 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER RE REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE by Hon. William Alsup finding as moot 20 Motion to Continue.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2015)
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DISMISSING IN FORMA PAUPERIS PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT re 14 Amended Complaint filed by Justin Merriman Amended Pleadings due by 9/21/2015.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/31/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2015)
August 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER VACATING ORDER TOSHOW CAUSE HEARING re 16 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/25/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2015)
August 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 9/17/2015 11:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 8/27/2015.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/13/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2015)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 10 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2015)
May 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. William Alsup. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/6/15. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Merriman v. Governor Jerry Brown et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Merriman
Represented By: John Eric Stringer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?