J KNIX LLC v. KNIX WEAR INC.
Plaintiff: J KNIX LLC
Defendant: KNIX WEAR INC.
Case Number: 3:2015cv01804
Filed: April 21, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1127
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ***DOCKETED IN ERROR - PLEASE DISREGARD*** ORDER VACATING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/20/2016. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2016) Modified on 4/20/2016 (tsh, COURT STAFF).
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER ADVANCING HEARING ON 36 MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF/COUNTERDEFENDANT TO APRIL 21, 2016. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/30/2016. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2016)
March 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER (1) VACATING DEADLINES FOR 60 DAYS AND (2) TO PROVIDE STATUS UPDATE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/3/2016. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J KNIX LLC v. KNIX WEAR INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J KNIX LLC
Represented By: Christopher James Passarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KNIX WEAR INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?