Raya v. AMAZON.COM, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Santiago Raya
Defendant: AMAZON.COM, LLC and Golden State FC, LLC
Case Number: 3:2015cv02005
Filed: May 4, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER RE: FINAL APPROVAL ORDER; DIRECTIONS TO PARTIES. The parties, in serving or otherwise distributing the Court's order granting final approval and dismissal, are directed to use the Final Order as filed February 15, 2017. (See Dkt. No. 107.) Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 02/15/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2017)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT FINAL APPROVAL HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 01/26/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2017)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE UPON APPROPRIATE FEDERAL AND STATE OFFICIALS. Defendants Amazon.com LLC and Golden State FC, LLC are directed to file, no later than December 7, 2016, proof of service of the notice required by 28 U.S.C. § 1715(b). Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 11/22/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2016)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 86 SECOND ORDER RE: PROPOSED CLASS NOTICE; DIRECTIONS TO PARTIES. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 09/27/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2016)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER RE: PROPOSED NOTICE AND PROPOSED CLAIM FORM; DIRECTIONS TO PARTIES. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 5, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2016)
July 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. The hearing on plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement is continued to Friday, July 29, 2016, at 9 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 21, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2016)
July 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER VACATING JULY 22, 2016 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 20, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2016)
May 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER RE CONSENT/DECLINATION. Signed by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton on 5/18/2016. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2016)
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference currently set for March 11, 2016 at 10:30 a.m. is vacated. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 9, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2016)
January 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; DENYING AS MOOT PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE. The Case Management Conference is continued from February 5, 2016, to March 11, 2016. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than March 4, 2016. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 28, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2016)
October 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE DECEMBER 4, 2015 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued from December 4, 2015, to February 5, 2016. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 28, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2015)
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING MEAL BREAK CLAIM. Plaintiff's individual cause of action for failure to provide second meal periods is dismissed with prejudice, and Plaintiff's proposed class/representative claim for failure to provide second meal periods is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 19, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2015)
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference currently set for October 2, 2015, is continued to December 4, 2015. No later than October 16, 2015, plaintiff must either dismiss his individual meal break claim or f ile a motion for leave to amend the complaint to replace the named plaintiff on the meal break claim. The case is referred to Magistrate Judge Grewal for a Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 30, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2015)
July 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS OR STAY Amazon's motion to dismiss or stay the instant action is denied. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 1, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2015)
June 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR REMAND The Court finds Amazon's calculation of potential monetary penalties under the Fourth Cause of Action is reasonable and that Amazon has met its burden of demonstrating an amount in controversy greater than $5 million. Accordingly, the motion to remand is denied. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 30, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2015)
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/29/15. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Raya v. AMAZON.COM, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMAZON.COM, LLC
Represented By: Rebecca D. Eisen
Represented By: Theresa C. Mak
Represented By: Joseph A. Nuccio
Represented By: Richard G. Rosenblatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden State FC, LLC
Represented By: Rebecca D. Eisen
Represented By: Theresa C. Mak
Represented By: Joseph A. Nuccio
Represented By: Richard G. Rosenblatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santiago Raya
Represented By: James Jason Hill
Represented By: Isam Charles Khoury
Represented By: Michael David Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?