United States of America v. Wilson
Appellant: United States of America
Appellee: Kirk Lindsay Wilson
Case Number: 3:2015cv02028
Filed: May 5, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Appeal
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 AMENDED NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Telephone Conference set for 3/7/2016 11:00 AM in before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Settlement Conference set for 3/17/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 2/23/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 2/23/2016. (Amended to include telephone conference.)(mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2016)
February 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 4/7/2016 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 3/7/2016. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 2/22/2016. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2016)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING DATE FOR ORAL ARGUMENT. Responses due by 1/28/2016. Replies due by 2/4/2016. Bankruptcy appeal matter hearing set for 2/18/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 1/21/2016. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: United States of America
Represented By: Jose Apolinar Olivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Kirk Lindsay Wilson
Represented By: Craig Kenneth Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?