Consumer Financial Protection Bureau v. Nationwide Biweekly Administration, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Consumer Financial Protection Bureau
Defendant: Nationwide Biweekly Administration, Inc., Loan Payment Administration LLC and Daniel S. Lipsky
Case Number: 3:2015cv02106
Filed: May 11, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 315 Opinion and Order. Signed by Judge Seeborg on 09/08/2017. (rslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2017)
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 290 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 289 post-trial matters and deadlines. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/10/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2017)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER granting motion to strike jury demand. Bench Trial set for 4/24/2017 09:00 AM before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/23/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2017)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER by Judge Seeborg granting 197 Motion for Extension of Time to File. (rslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2017)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 196 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 195 shortening time for briefing and hearing on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/10/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2017)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg denying 123 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 124 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 132 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 182 Administrative Motion to amend scheduling order.(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2017)
December 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION TO STRIKE, AND VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/13/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2016)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 96 STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING CASE SCHEDULE: Further Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 11/17/2016 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Designation of experts due 9/7/2016; opening disclosures/reports due 10/24/2016; f act discovery cut-off due 11/10/2016; expert discovery cut-off due 12/8/2016; dispositive motions filed by 12/8/2016, oppositions filed by 1/5/2017, replies filed by 1/19/2017; hearings on dispositive motions by 2/9/2017. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/3/2016.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2016)
July 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 89 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 88 Setting Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/18/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2016)
May 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER RE MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTERCLAIM AND MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/23/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2016)
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 STIPULATION AND ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule on Plaintiff's Motion to Strike and Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/17/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2016)
January 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 JOIN STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED ANSWER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/19/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2016)
January 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting 59 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting 63 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2016)
November 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/16/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Selection/Jury Trial set for 4/24/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/13/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2015)
August 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER, Case referred to mediation. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/5/2015 at 11:00 AM to be held telephonically. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/20/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2015)
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg denying 11 Motion to Transfer Case. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2015)
May 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Richard Seeborg. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/21/15. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Consumer Financial Protection Bureau v. Nationwide Biweekly Administration, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Biweekly Administration, Inc.
Represented By: Nathan L. Colvin
Represented By: Sean Eric Ponist
Represented By: Eric W. Richardson
Represented By: Glenn V. Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loan Payment Administration LLC
Represented By: Nathan L. Colvin
Represented By: Sean Eric Ponist
Represented By: Eric W. Richardson
Represented By: Glenn V. Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel S. Lipsky
Represented By: Nathan L. Colvin
Represented By: Sean Eric Ponist
Represented By: Eric W. Richardson
Represented By: Glenn V. Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Consumer Financial Protection Bureau
Represented By: Melanie Hirsch
Represented By: Edward S. Keefe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?